Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 64913
Short Caption:STATE VS. HARRIS (MARIANN)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C275959Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Pretrial
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:01/04/2017 at 10:00 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:01/04/2017How Submitted:After Oral Argument
Expedited

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/31/2014Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
01/31/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Filed certified copy of notice of appeal.14-03286
01/31/2014Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request.14-03353
02/21/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Show Cause and Suspending Briefing. Appellant's counsel shall have 20 days from the date of this order to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Respondent shall have 10 days from the filing of any response to file any reply. The deadlines for filing documents are suspended until further order of this court.14-05832
03/07/2014MotionFiled Answer to Order to Show Cause.14-07438
03/18/2014MotionFiled Reply to Appellant's Answer to Order to Show Cause.14-08633
07/30/2015Opinion/Non-DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Appeal is allowed to proceed." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Saitta, J. Majority: Saitta/Hardesty/Parraguirre/Douglas/Cherry/Gibbons/Pickering. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 56.15-22991
09/29/2015Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 9/23/13 and 10/08/13. To Court Reporter: Joann Melendez.15-29466
09/29/2015Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 10/02/13. To Court Reporter: Department IX.15-29484
10/14/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Reinstating Briefing. In our opinion issued July 30, 2015 we determined that this court has jurisdiction over the appeal, and that this appeal may proceed. We reinstate the briefing schedule as follows: Appellant shall have 40 days from the date of this order to file the Fast Track Statement and Appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 3C(f).15-31314
11/23/2015MotionFiled Motion for Enlargement of Time. (Fast Track Statement)15-35664
11/24/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: January 7, 2016.15-36029
01/07/2016MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time - Second Request (Fast Track Statement).16-00469
01/20/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: January 27, 2016.16-02021
01/27/2016MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time - Third Request (Fast Track Statement and Appendix).16-02828
02/04/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: February 10, 2016.16-03755
02/10/2016MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time - Fourth Request (Fast Track Statement and Appendix).16-04395
02/17/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: February 22, 2016.16-05132
02/22/2016MotionFiled Motion to File a Fast Track Statement in Excess of Type-Volume Limitations.16-05645
02/22/2016AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 1.16-05650
02/22/2016AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 2.16-05652
02/22/2016AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 3.16-05653
02/22/2016AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 4.16-05654
02/22/2016AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 5.16-05655
02/22/2016AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 6.16-05656
02/22/2016AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 7.16-05657
02/22/2016AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 8.16-05659
02/22/2016AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 9.16-05660
02/22/2016AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 10.16-05661
02/29/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the fast track statement received via E-Flex on February 22, 2016. Fast Track Response due: 20 days.16-06408
02/29/2016Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement.16-06409
03/21/2016Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast track Response due: March 28, 2016.16-08873
03/28/2016MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time to File Fast Track Response.16-09711
04/04/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Fast Track Response due: April 26, 2016.16-10467
04/27/2016MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time to File Fast Track Response.16-13170
05/03/2016MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Leave to File Fast Track Response in Excess of Type-Volume Limitations.16-13809
05/11/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motions. The clerk of this court shall file the fast track response received via E-Flex on May 3, 2016. Fast Track Reply due: 14 days.16-14760
05/11/2016Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response.16-14762
05/25/2016MotionFiled Motion for Leave to File a Reply to Fast Track Response in Excess of Type-Volume Limitations.16-16410
06/08/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Cause appearing, we grant appellant's motion for leave to file a fast track reply in excess of the type-volume limitation. The clerk of this court shall file the fast track reply received via E-Flex on May 25, 2016.16-17904
06/08/2016Fast Track BriefFiled Reply to Fast Track Response.16-17905
06/08/2016Case Status UpdateFast Track Briefing Completed.
06/15/2016MotionFiled Motion to File Errata and Errata to fast track Response.16-18655
07/06/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent has filed a motion for leave to file errata to the fast track response. Respondent's motion includes the proposed errata. Cause appearing, the motion is granted.16-20886
11/14/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.16-35282
11/28/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Wednesday, January 4, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City.16-36748
12/21/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.16-39671
01/04/2017Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
05/08/2017Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the district court order granting respondent's presentence motion for a new trial REVERSED AND REMAND for sentencing." STIGLICH, J., with whom CHERRY, C.J., GIBBONS, J., agree, dissenting. EN BANC.17-15083
05/30/2017Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent's Petition for Rehearing.17-17850
06/01/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition For Rehearing. Answer due: 15 days.17-18210
06/16/2017MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Petition for Rehearing - First Request.17-20056
06/27/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Answer to Petition for Rehearing due: July 17, 2017.17-21312
07/17/2017MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File State's Answer to Petition for Rehearing - Second Request.17-23690
08/21/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the answer to the petition for rehearing, provisionally received on August 1, 2017.17-27887
08/21/2017Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Answer to Petition for Rehearing.17-27888
09/21/2017Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c).17-31962
10/16/2017RemittiturIssued Remittitur.17-35232
10/16/2017Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/03/2017RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by the District Court Clerk on October 21, 2017.17-35232