Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 65040
Short Caption:O'KEEFE (BRIAN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):44372, 44644, 48673, 49329, 66785, 81867, 81867-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C202793Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/23/2014How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/20/2014Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
02/20/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.14-05622
02/20/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Minutes (SEALED).
03/05/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document (Order filed 2/14/14). Due date: 10 days.14-07068
03/11/2014Order/IncomingFiled District court order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on February 14, 2014. (Order Denying Deft's Pro per (Ex Parte) Motion to Appoint Counsel...)14-07750
03/19/2014MotionFiled Proper Person Motion to Consolidate - Pro Se Motion to Joinder Supreme Court Cases 64878 with 65040 Based on Both Cases being Writs - Mandamus/Coram-Nobis Filed Closely Together. Nos. 64878/65040.14-08891
04/02/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record. Record due from district court clerk: 45 days.14-10393
04/23/2014Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volumes 1-6. Via FTP.14-13039
04/23/2014Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
04/25/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Minutes (SEALED).
04/25/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk. Pre-Sentence Investigation Report (SEALED).
06/03/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Notice - Change of Address. Nos. 65217/65040/64878.14-17902
07/23/2014Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgments of the district court AFFIRMED." fn2[We have reviewed all documents that appellant has submitted in proper person to the clerk of this court in this matter, and we conclude that no relief based upon those submissions is warranted.] NNP14-KP/RP/NS Nos. 65040/65217.14-23908
08/15/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion and Staying Remittitur. Issuance of the remittitur shall be stayed until December 1, 2014. If the clerk of this court receives written notice by December 1, 2014, from the clerk of the United States Supreme Court that appellant has filed a petition for a writ of certiorari, the stay shall continue in effect until final disposition of the certiorari proceedings. If such notice is not received by December 1, 2014, the remittitur shall issue on December 8, 2014.14-26842
12/08/2014RemittiturIssued Remittitur.14-39798
12/08/2014Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed
12/16/2014RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on December 11, 2014.14-39798
01/21/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from US Supreme Court/Certiorari Denied. The petition for a writ of certiorari is denied.15-02204