Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 65064
Short Caption:BAXTER VS. DIGNITY HEALTHCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):75178, 75335, 75374, 75427, 75429, 75432, 75730, 75849
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A687208Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:02/26/2014 / Schofield, PaulSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:06/02/2015 at 2:00 PMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:06/02/2015How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/24/2014Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Gary Logan. Check no. 12751.
02/24/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)14-06039
02/24/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Case Appeal Statement. Corrected case appeal statement due: 10 days.14-06042
02/24/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.14-06044
02/26/2014Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Paul H. Schofield.14-06373
02/28/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance of Counsel. (Attorney Shirley Blazich with Alverson Taylor Mortensen & Sanders fore respondent Dignity Health)14-06691
03/03/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Corrected Case Appeal Statement.14-06799
03/10/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance Thomas J. Doyle, Esq., for the Respondent, Syed Akbarullah, M.D.14-07600
03/11/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge.14-07678
03/12/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service of Notice of Appearance.14-08047
03/13/2014Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.14-08133
03/25/2014Docketing StatementFiled Dignity Health d/b/a St. Rose Domincan Hospital's Respnse to Appellant's Docketing Statement pursuant to NEV.R.APP.P 14(f).14-09350
03/28/2014Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled.14-09842
03/31/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Association of Counsel - Robert McBride, Esq. and Heather S. Hall, Esq. of the law offices of Carroll, Kelly, Trotter, Franzen, McKenna, & Peabody associate with Mandelbaum Ellerton & McBride as counsel for respondent Brian Lipman, M.D.14-10074
03/31/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Joinder - Brian Lipman, M.D.'s Joinder to Respondent Dignity Health's Response to Appellant's Docketing Statement Pursuant.14-10113
04/02/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Joinder Syed Akbarullah, M.D.'s Joinder to Dignity Health Response to Appellant's Docketing Statement.14-10349
04/07/2014Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. Notice to Appear. Settlement conference scheduled for April 18, 2014, at 10:00 a.m.14-11010
04/08/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Joinder -Respondents IPC The Hospitalist Co. Inc, Quiroz DO, Bhatia DO, Gordon DO & Jamison DNP's Joinder to Respondent Dignity Health's Response to Appelant's Docketing Statement Pursuant to NRAP 14(f).14-11067
04/08/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge (Respondents IPC The Hospitalist Co. Inc, Quiroz DO, Bhatia DO, Gordon DO & Jamison DNP's Joinder to Respondent Dignity Health's Response to Appelant's Docketing Statement Pursuant to NRAP 14(f)). Due date: 10 days.14-11133
04/09/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorney (Respondent Brian Lipman, M.D., substitutes the law firm of Carroll, Kelly, Trotter, Franzen, McKenna & Peabody as his attorney of record in the place and stead of Mandelbaum, Ellerton & McBride).14-11308
04/09/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service on Settlement Judge (Respondents IPC The Hospitalist Co. Inc, Quiroz DO, Bhatia DO, Gordon DO & Jamison DNP's Joinder to Respondent Dignity Health's Response to Appelant's Docketing Statement Pursuant to NRAP 14(f)).14-11364
04/09/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge (Substitution of Attorney - Respondent Brian Lipman, MD).14-11366
04/11/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Amended Certificate of Service re: Substitution of Attorney (served on settlement judge).14-11804
04/22/2014Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.14-12961
04/29/2014Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix.14-13888
05/05/2014Transcript RequestFiled Certificate that No Transcript is Being Requested.14-14432
07/24/2014BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.14-24178
07/24/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Joint Appendix.14-24186
08/06/2014BriefFiled Answering Brief Respondent Brian Lipman, M.D.'s Answering Brief14-25730
08/19/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Syed Akbarullah, M.D.'s Joinder to Respondent Brian Lipman, M.D.'s Answering Brief Pursuant to NRAP 28(i).14-27221
08/25/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Joinder -Respondent IPC the Hospitalist Company, Inc., Quiroz DO, Bhatia DO, Gordon DO and Jamison DNP's Joinder to Respondent Brian Lipman MD's Answering Brief Pursuant to NRAP 28(i).14-27867
08/25/2014BriefFiled Respondents' Joint Answering Brief (Dignity Health and St. Rose Dominican Hospitals).14-27979
08/25/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Joinder Dignity Health d/b/a St. Rose Dominican Hospital's Joinder to Respondent Brian Lipman, M.D.'s Answering Brief Pursuant to NRAP 28(i).14-27993
10/08/2014Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. No reply brief filed.
11/12/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Firm Address. (Carroll, Kelly, Trotter, Franzen, McKenna & Peabody)14-37226
11/13/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting Appeal for Decision Without Oral Argument.14-37456
11/13/2014Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
04/28/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.15-12850
04/30/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Tuesday, June 2, 2015, at 2:00 p.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas.15-13186
05/20/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.15-15582
06/02/2015Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
09/24/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Pickering, J. Majority: Pickering/Hardesty/Parraguirre/Douglas/Cherry/Saitta/Gibbons. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 76. EN BANC15-28882
10/19/2015RemittiturIssued Remittitur.15-31740
10/19/2015Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/27/2015RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 22, 2015.15-31740
02/10/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter dated February 8, 2016, to publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 62059/(61103/61640)/62745/63737/64881/65273/64214/61131/(60673/61390)/62061/64130/64484/65064/65632/66346/59685/(61305/61871)/(61324/63258)/65335/54389/64569 (Letter entered in 62059 as document no. 16-04455.)