Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 65122
Short Caption:FULBRIGHT & JAWORSKI LLP VS. DIST. CT. (VERANO LAND GRP., LP)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):61140, 61169, 70059
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A655514Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Prohibition
Disqualifications:ParraguirreCase Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:12/09/2014 at 4:00 PMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:12/09/2014How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/04/2014Filing FeeFiling fee due for Petition.
03/04/2014Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Prohibition.14-06943
03/04/2014OtherJustice Ron Parraguirre disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Law Firms - Kemp, Jones, Coulthard.
03/04/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 1.14-06950
03/04/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 2.14-06951
03/04/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 3.14-06954
03/04/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 4.14-06955
03/04/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.14-06957
03/04/2014Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Kelly H. Dove.
03/04/2014MotionFiled Request for Judicial Notice.14-06996
06/19/2014BriefFiled Petitioner's Supplemental Authorities to Petition for Writ of Prohibition.14-20214
07/01/2014MotionFiled Petitioners' Motion to Stay Pending Appeal.14-21457
07/11/2014MotionFiled Verano Land Group, LP's Opposition to Motion to Stay Pending Appeal.14-22673
07/18/2014MotionFiled Petitioners' Reply to Opposition to Motion to Stay Pending Appeal.14-23424
08/08/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Real Party in Interest's Answer due: 20 days. Petitioners shall have ten days from service of the answer to file and serve any reply. fn1[We defer ruling on petitioners' motions for a stay of the district court proceedings and for judicial notice at this time.]14-25981
08/28/2014Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Real party in interest's answer to writ petition due: September 5, 2014.14-28492
09/08/2014MotionFiled Request for Judicial Notice.14-29544
09/08/2014Petition/WritFiled Answer to Fulbright & Jaworski LLP and Jane Macon's Petition for Writ of Prohibition.14-29558
09/08/2014AppendixFiled Real Party in Interest Verano Land Group, LP's Appendix to Answer to Petition for Writ.14-29559
09/19/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Errata to Petition for Writ of Prohibition.14-31239
09/19/2014MotionFiled Petitioners' Response to Verano Land Group LP's Request for Judicial Notice.14-31269
09/19/2014Petition/WritFiled Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Prohibition.14-31280
09/19/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Amended Certificate of Service to Petitioners' Response to Verano Land Group LP's Request for Judicial Notice.14-31288
09/26/2014MotionFiled Reply in Support of Request for Judicial Notice.14-32190
10/29/2014MotionFiled Petitioner's Request to Expedite Ruling on Motion to Stay Pending Resolution of Writ Proceedings.14-35952
11/03/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Notice Of Intent to File Opposition to Petitioners' Request to Expedite Ruling on Motion to Stay Pending Resolution of Writ Proceedings.14-36204
11/04/2014MotionFiled Opposition to Petitioners' Request to Expedite Ruling on Motion to Stay Pending Resolution of Writ Proceedings.14-36509
11/12/2014MotionFiled Reply in Support of Petitioners' Request to Expedite Ruling on Motion to Stay Pending Resolution of Writ Proceedings.14-37111
11/21/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Stay. We hereby stay the proceedings in District Court Case No. A655514, as they relate to the petitioners and real party in interest, pending further order of this court. Douglas, J., dissenting. Fn1[Petitioners' March 4, 2014, request for judicial notice is granted as to Exhibit 1. As to Exhibits 2-4, the request is denied. Real party in interest's September 8, 2014, request for judicial notice is denied for the same reason.]14-38459
12/02/2014MotionFiled Emergency Motion for Clarification or Reconsideration Regarding Stay, and for Expedited Consideration of Writ Proceedings Relief Needed as Soon as Possible to Preserve Firm Trial Setting Granted.14-39182
12/03/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is hereby scheduled before the Southern Panel on December 9, 2014, at the hour of 4:00 p.m., in Las Vegas at the Regional Justice Center. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. Fn1[If the parties are unable to attend oral argument as scheduled, this matter shall stand submitted on December 10, 2014, on the documents filed herein.]14-39420
12/09/2014Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP14 JH/MD/MC.
12/17/2014MotionFiled Motion to File Supplemental Appendix Regarding Documents and Questions Raised by Court at the December 9, 2014 Oral Argument. (Supplemental Appendix attached).14-41087
12/17/2014MotionFiled Notice of Intent to Oppose Verano Land Group's Motion to File Supplemental Appendix Regarding Documents and Questions Raised by Court at the December 9, 2014 Oral Argument.14-41151
12/29/2014MotionFiled Petitioners' Opposition to Verano Land Group's Motion to File Supplemental Appendix Regarding Documents and Questions Raised by Court at the December 9, 2014 Oral Argument.14-42317
01/06/2015MotionFiled Reply in Support of Verano Land Group's Motion to File Supplemental Appendix Regarding Documents and Questions Raised by Court at the December 9, 2014 Oral Argument.15-00527
02/05/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition granted in part and denied in part." We direct the clerk of this court to issue a writ of prohibition instructing the district court to vacate its order denying petitioners' motion to dismiss. Fn8[In this regard, Verano's December 17, 2014, motion to file a supplemental appendix is denied.] Fn9[In light of our resolution of this writ petition, the stay imposed by our November 21, 2014, order is vacated.] Before: Hardesty/Douglas/Cherry. Author: Hardesty, C.J. Majority: Hardesty/Douglas/Cherry. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 5. SNP1415-03814
02/05/2015WritIssued Writ with letter. Original and one copy of writ and copy of opinion mailed to Kelly Dove for service upon Judge Nancy L. Allf.15-03868
02/13/2015WritFiled Returned Writ. Original Writ returned. Served on Judge Nancy L. Allf on February 10, 2015.15-04957
03/02/2015RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.15-06461
03/02/2015Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/13/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter to Publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. (Letter dated March 12, 2015) Nos. 60478/63311/61193/62606/63787/61946/62107/65122/58904/59815. (Letter entered in 60478 as document no. 15-07810.)