Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 65158
Short Caption:GARCIA (JUAN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):42403, 44006, 47059, 48123, 56137, 62119, 65777, 69458, 70604, 70604-COA, 71005, 71005-COA, 71006, 71006-COA, 80987, 80988
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C178581Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/25/2014How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/07/2014Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
03/07/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.14-07351
04/02/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record. Record due from district court clerk: 45 days.14-10388
04/25/2014Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 1-11. Via FTP.14-13513
04/25/2014Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
05/01/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk. Pages 281-288 of ROA-Pre-Sentence Investigation Report (SEALED).
05/01/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk. Pages 301-309 of ROA-Pre-Sentence Investigation Report (SEALED).
07/23/2014Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP14-KP/RP/NS14-23914
08/21/2014RemittiturIssued Remittitur.14-27590
08/21/2014Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/09/2014RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 28, 2014.14-27590