Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 65168
Short Caption:JOHNSON (DONTE) VS. STATE (DEATH PENALTY-PC)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):36093, 36461, 36991, 45059, 45456, 51306, 67492
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C153154Classification:Criminal Appeal - Death Penalty - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:04/03/2017 at 10:00 AMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas
Submission Date:04/03/2017How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/07/2014Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
03/07/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)14-07425
03/11/2014Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.14-07889
03/18/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Due date: 10 days. (Findings of Fact filed 3/17/14)14-08719
03/21/2014Order/IncomingFiled District court order. Certified copy of order Findings of Fact filed in district court on 3/17/2014.14-09152
04/01/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Request Transcripts. Due date: 10 days.14-10282
04/03/2014Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request .14-10668
07/07/2014MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief.14-22018
07/16/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until October 6, 2014, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix.14-23070
07/24/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Endorsement of Pro Per Document Filed July 21,2014.14-24184
07/25/2014MotionFiled Response to Notice of Endorsement of Pro Per Document.14-24266
08/13/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The clerk of this court shall file the proper person letter received on July 21, 2014. The motion for a remand is denied. Because appellant is represented by counsel in this appeal and the opening brief has not yet been filed, his request to file a supplemental opening brief is also denied.14-26588
08/13/2014MotionFiled Proper Person Motion Requesting to File a Proper Person Supplemental Opening Brief.14-23561
10/06/2014MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief.14-33116
10/10/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. The motion for a 90-day extension of time is denied. Appellant's opening brief due: December 5, 2014.14-33700
12/05/2014MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief.14-39731
12/26/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: January 9, 2015.14-42167
01/09/2015BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.15-00972
01/09/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 1.15-00973
01/09/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 2.15-00974
01/09/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 3.15-00976
01/09/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 4.15-00977
01/09/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 5.15-00978
01/09/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 6.15-00979
01/09/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 7.15-00982
01/09/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 8.15-00983
01/09/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 9.15-00984
01/09/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 10.15-00985
01/09/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 11.15-01009
01/09/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 12.15-01010
01/09/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 13.15-01011
01/09/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 14.15-01018
01/09/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 15.15-01019
01/09/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 16.15-01020
01/09/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 18.15-01021
01/09/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 19.15-01022
01/09/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 17.15-01024
01/09/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 20.15-01025
01/09/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 21.15-01026
01/09/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 22.15-01027
01/09/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 23.15-01029
01/09/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 24.15-01030
01/09/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 25.15-01033
01/09/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 26.15-01037
01/09/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 27.15-01038
01/09/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 28.15-01039
01/09/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 29.15-01040
01/09/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 30.15-01041
01/09/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 31.15-01042
01/09/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 32.15-01043
01/09/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 33.15-01044
01/09/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 34.15-01045
01/09/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 35.15-01046
01/09/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 36.15-01047
01/09/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 37.15-01048
01/09/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 38.15-01049
01/09/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 39.15-01050
01/09/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 40.15-01052
01/09/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 41.15-01053
01/09/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 42.15-01054
01/09/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 43.15-01063
02/10/2015MotionFiled Motion for Enlargement of Time (Answering Brief).15-04345
02/13/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: April 10, 2015.15-04879
04/10/2015MotionFiled Motion for Enlargement of Time Second Request (Answering Brief).15-10829
04/17/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: May 11, 2015.15-11625
05/07/2015BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.15-13969
05/07/2015AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix Vol 1.15-13980
05/07/2015AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix Vol 2.15-13982
06/08/2015MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief. (60 days)15-17348
06/12/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Reply Brief due: August 7, 2015.15-17964
08/07/2015MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief.15-23828
08/14/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Reply Brief due: October 6, 2015.15-24608
10/08/2015MotionFiled Untimely Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief.15-30558
10/16/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a third extension of time (60 days) to file the reply brief. The motion is denied. Reply Brief due: November 13, 2015.15-31528
11/13/2015MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Enlarge Page Limitation on Appellant's Reply Brief.15-34723
11/18/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Cause appearing, appellant's motion for leave to file a reply brief in excess of the type-volume limitation is granted. The clerk of this court shall file the reply brief received on November 13, 2015.15-35252
11/18/2015BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.15-35254
11/18/2015Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
02/08/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order. This matter was previously submitted on the briefs and record filed herein. Upon further review, the court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.17-04539
02/23/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Monday, April 3, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas.17-06263
03/20/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.17-09208
04/03/2017Letter/IncomingFiled Letter From Las Vegas Review-Journal to Request Camera Access to the Nevada Supreme Court Arguments Scheduled for Monday, April 3 (via fax).17-10891
04/03/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Media Request. Permission is granted for photographic or electronic media coverage of the court proceedings. Wesley Juhl of the Las Vegas Review Journal is designated as the pool coordinator. All equipment necessary to allow for such photographic or electronic coverage of such proceedings shall be placed in the courtroom before 10:00 a.m.17-10913
04/03/2017Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
10/05/2017Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Cherry, C.J. Majority: Cherry/Douglas/Gibbons/Pickering/Hardesty/Parraguirre/Stiglich.133 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 73. EN BANC17-33799
10/23/2017MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Rehearing.17-36273
11/06/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Petition for Rehearing due: November 22, 2017. Failure to comply with this order will result in the clerk of this court issuing the remittitur forthwith.17-37992
11/22/2017Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for Rehearing.17-40343
01/19/2018Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). En Banc.18-02613
02/13/2018RemittiturIssued Remittitur.18-05867
02/13/2018Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/09/2018RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on February 22, 2018.18-05867