The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Administrative Case: ADKT 0495
Short Caption:IN RE: AMENDMENT TO RULE OF PROFESSIONAL CONDUCT 1.2 (MEDICAL MARIJUANA)Classification:Administrative - ADKT - ADKT
Case Status:Public Hearing Held
Filed Date:03/11/2014Public Hearing:05/06/2014 at 3:00 PM (Supreme Court Courtroom, Carson City)
Closed Date:

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/11/2014Administrative CaseFiled Petition. (via E-mail)Y14-07877
03/13/2014Administrative CaseFiled Petition. (Original)
03/13/2014Administrative CaseFiled Order Scheduling Public Hearing. Tuesday, May 6, 2014, at 3:00 p.m. in the Supreme Court Courtroom, Carson City. Videoconferenced to the RJC in Las Vegas. Written comments invited. Original and 8 copies due by 5:00 p.m., May 1, 2014. (Exhibit A attached)14-08223
03/18/2014Administrative CaseFiled Letter from Ariana Cramer with KRNV News 4 regarding cameras in the courtroom for the public hearing being held on Tuesday, May 6, 2014, at 3:00 p.m.14-08742
03/19/2014Administrative CaseFiled Order Granting Media Request. Permission is granted for photographic or electronic media coverage. Ariana Cramer of KRNV News 4 is designated as pool coordinator.14-08862
04/30/2014Administrative CaseFiled Public Comment of the City of Reno from Fahrendorf, Viloria Oliphant & Oster, L.L.P.14-14006
05/01/2014Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Washoe County District Attorney Richard Gammick.14-14103
05/01/2014Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Black & Lobello.14-14131
05/06/2014Administrative CasePublic Hearing held on the Administrative Docket.
05/07/2014Administrative CaseFiled Order Adopting Comment [1] to Nevada Rule of Professional Conduct 1.2. Comment [1] shall be appended to the Nevada Rules of Professional Conduct 1.2 and shall read as set forth in Exhibit A. Comment [1] to Nevada Rule of Professional Conduct 1.2 shall be effective immediately.14-14777
05/08/2014Administrative CaseFiled Order for Supplemental Briefing and Extending Period for Public Comment. The court hereby directs the Board of Governors of the Nevada State Bar to supplement its petition. Supplemental Petition due: June 30, 2014. Written comments invited. Original and 8 copies due by 5:00 p.m., May 30, 2014.14-14926
06/02/2014Administrative CaseFiled State Bar of Nevada's Motion to Extend Time in Which to File Supplemental Petition.14-17806
06/26/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The Board of Governors of the State Bar shall have until September 30, 2014, in which to file the supplement.14-21018