The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 65193
Short Caption:SCHOFIELD (MICHAEL) VS. STATEClassification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Direct
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C287009Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: Panel
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:02/11/2016 at 1:30 PMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:02/11/2016How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/12/2014Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
03/12/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.14-08082
03/19/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Suspending Briefing. The clerk of the district court shall immediately transmit a certified copy of the judgment to the clerk of this court. The deadlines for the filing of documents are hereby suspended pending further order of this court.14-08802
07/24/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Entry and Transmission of Written Judgment of Conviction. District Court Order due: 30 days.14-24125
07/28/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy Judgment filed in district court on July 28, 2014.14-24504
07/28/2014Order/IncomingFiled District court order. Certified copy of Judment of Conviction (Jury Trial) filed in district court on 7/28/14.14-24533
08/13/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order of Limited Remand. District Court Order Appointing Counsel due: 35 days.14-26580
08/20/2014Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order Appointing Counsel. Filed certified copy of district court minute order appointing Karen K. Wong, Esq. as counsel for appellant.14-27528
08/28/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental.14-28489
09/04/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Reinstating Briefing. Transcript Request Form due: 20 days. Opening Brief and Appendix due: 120 days.14-29173
09/24/2014Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 7/21/14. To Court Reporter: Jessica Kirkpatrick.14-31834
09/24/2014Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals.14-31835
12/12/2014MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix.14-40571
12/12/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief due: February 2, 2015.14-40597
02/02/2015MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix.15-03417
02/06/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: March 19, 2015.15-04023
03/20/2015BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.15-08484
03/20/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume I.15-08485
03/20/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume II.15-08486
03/20/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume III.15-08487
03/20/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume IV.15-08489
03/20/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume V.15-08490
03/20/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume VI.15-08492
03/20/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume VII.15-08493
04/20/2015MotionFiled Motion for Enlargement of Time.15-11899
04/24/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: June 19, 2015.15-12537
06/19/2015MotionFiled Motion for Enlargement of Time (Answering Brief).15-18817
08/05/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's motion requesting a second extension of time to file the answering brief is granted. The clerk shall file the answering brief and appendix received on July 20, 2015. Reply due: 30 days.15-23663
08/05/2015BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.15-23664
08/05/2015AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix.15-23665
09/04/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Reply Brief due: September 14, 2015.15-26935
09/14/2015MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief.15-27767
09/16/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Reply Brief due: October 5, 2015.15-27993
10/06/2015BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.15-30246
10/06/2015Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
01/06/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.16-00350
01/08/2016MotionFiled Motion for Consideration in Scheduling Oral Argument.16-00594
01/12/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Thursday, February 11, 2016, at 1:30 p.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas.16-00981
01/29/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.16-03091
02/11/2016Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP16-JH/NS/KP.
04/21/2016Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed." Before: Hardesty/Saitta/Pickering. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Saitta/Pickering.132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 26. SNP16-JH/NS/KP16-12413
05/16/2016RemittiturIssued Remittitur.16-15182
05/16/2016Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/10/2016RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 27, 2016.16-15182
08/08/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter dated June 30, 2016 to Publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 66816/(59691/68304)/66888/65193/65388/(67756/67763)/68476/63178/62720/64281 (Letter entered in 66816 as document no. 16-24439.)