Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 65242
Short Caption:FORD VS. BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST CO.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A640110Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:04/01/2014 / Levitt, LansfordSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/01/2015How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/20/2014Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal.
03/20/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.14-08978
03/20/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.14-08980
03/20/2014Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Timothy P. Thomas
03/21/2014Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 1/28/14 To Court Reporter: Kristy Clark.14-09145
03/24/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing statement due: 20 days.14-09240
04/01/2014Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Phillip Aurbach.14-10209
04/01/2014Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Settlement Judge Reassignment. Issued Amended Notice of Assignment to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. New Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt.14-10301
04/07/2014TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Kristy Clark stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 1/28/14.14-10913
04/10/2014Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.14-11507
04/16/2014Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation.14-12305
04/25/2014Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellants: 45 days to file the opening brief and appendix.14-13495
05/14/2014MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time for Filing Appellants' Opening Brief Pursuant to NRAP 31(B)(3).14-15745
06/06/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time. Appellant: Opening Brief and Appendix due: July 18, 2014.14-18540
07/18/2014BriefFiled Appellants' Opening Brief.14-23393
07/18/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Appellants' Opening Brief, Part One of Three.14-23394
08/22/2014BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.14-27762
08/22/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Signed certificate for answering brief due: 10 days.14-27765
08/22/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Compliance.14-27858
09/23/2014BriefFiled Appellants' Reply Brief.14-31533
09/23/2014Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
05/01/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision without Oral Argument.15-13351
07/23/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before: Parraguirre/Douglas/Cherry. Author: Parraguirre, J. Majority: Parraguirre/Douglas/Cherry. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 53. SNP15-RP/MD/MC15-22299
08/17/2015RemittiturIssued Remittitur.15-24766
08/17/2015Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/25/2015RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 20, 2015.15-24766