Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 65273
Short Caption:MERLINO (CARRIE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):65273-COA, 67260, 67260-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C282844Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/25/2014Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
03/25/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Filed certified copy of notice of appeal. (Fast Track Notice issued to counsel for appellant.)14-09437
03/28/2014TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Michelle Ramsey stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 07/19/13.14-09877
04/01/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Re: Entry of Written Judgment and Suspending Briefing. District Court Order due: 30 days. The deadlines for the filing of documents are hereby suspended until further order of this court.14-10234
04/02/2014TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. J. Kirkpatrick stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 7/30/12, 2/11/13, 2/20/13, 7/15/13, 7/17/13.14-10397
04/07/2014Order/IncomingFiled District court order. Certified copy of Amendment of Judgment of Conviction (Jury Trial) filed in district court on 4/01/14.14-10852
04/07/2014TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Renee Vincent stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 7/18/12.14-10979
04/15/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Reinstating Briefing. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: 40 days.14-12126
04/18/2014TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Kristy Clark stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 7/23/2013.14-12552
05/27/2014MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time Due to Missing Transcripts (Fast Track Statement).14-17156
06/09/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until July 11, 2014, to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix.14-18665
06/09/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Transcripts. Court reporter Peggy Isom's certificate due: 14 days. If Ms. Isom believes she is not responsble for filing and delivering these transcripts, she shall inform this court in writing within 7 days from the date of this order. Fn1[A copy of the transcript request form is attached.]14-18670
06/26/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Court Reporter Kristy Clark's Notice - Affidavit of Clarification of hearing dated 7/23/2013.14-21037
07/08/2014TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Peggy Isom stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 7/22/13 & 7/24/13.14-22074
07/11/2014MotionFiled Motion for Extension to File FTS due to Missing Transcript.14-22625
07/18/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Transcript. Court reporter Jennifer Daly's certificate due: 14 days. If Ms. Daly believes that she is not responsible for filing and delivering the transcript, she shall inform this court in writing within 7 days from the date of this order. Fn1[A copy of the transcript request form is attached.]14-23428
07/25/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant: Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: August 25, 2014.14-24355
08/13/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Conditionally Imposing Sanctions. Conditional sanction of $ 250 due: 15 days or Court Reporter Jennifer Daly's Ceritficate of Delivery of Transcripts or Motion due: 11 days.14-26539
08/25/2014MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File FTS Due to Missing Trial Transcript.14-28060
09/08/2014TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Jennifer O'Neill stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 7/23/14.14-29689
09/19/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant: Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: October 9, 2014.14-31197
09/23/2014TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Jennifer O'Neill stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 7/23/13.14-31608
10/07/2014MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to file FTS Due to Missing Transcript Previously Unknown to the Appellant.14-33333
10/10/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's fast track statement and appendix due: November 24, 2014.14-33710
11/24/2014Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement.14-38620
11/24/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement Vol I.14-38621
11/24/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement Vol II.14-38622
11/24/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement Vol III.14-38623
11/24/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement Vol IV.14-38624
11/24/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement Vol V.14-38643
11/24/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement Vol VI.14-38644
12/15/2014Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response.14-40789
01/09/2015Case Status UpdateFast Track Briefing Completed. No Reply Filed.
01/16/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order. This appeal may be assigned to the court of appeals for disposition. Each party shall have until February 2, 2015, to file a written statement of no more than 500 words. No extensions of time will be granted.15-01775
01/20/2015MotionFiled Response to Order of The Court.15-01969
02/02/2015MotionFiled Response to Order - Appellant's Response to January 16, 2015 Order.15-03433
02/03/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Transferring Case to Court of Appeals. The clerk of this court is directed to assign this appeal to the Court of Appeals of Nevada for disposition.15-03593
09/10/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled "Vacated in part." Before Gibbons/Tao/Silver. Author: Tao, J. Majority: Tao/Gibbons/Silver. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 65. Court of Appeals/Gibbons/Tao/Silver.
10/05/2015Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals.
10/05/2015RemittiturIssued Remittitur.15-30055
10/05/2015Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/20/2015RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 8, 2015.15-30055
02/10/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter dated February 8, 2016, to publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 62059/(61103/61640)/62745/63737/64881/65273/64214/61131/(60673/61390)/62061/64130/64484/65064/65632/66346/59685/(61305/61871)/(61324/63258)/65335/54389/64569 (Letter entered in 62059 as document no. 16-04455.)