The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 65364
Short Caption:SCENIC NEVADA, INC. VS. CITY OF RENOClassification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV1202863Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: En Banc
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:06/02/2014 / Millie, CarolSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:11/03/2015 at 10:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:11/03/2015How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/07/2014Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court.
04/07/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)14-10954
04/07/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.14-10957
04/09/2014Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Law Offices of Mark Wray Trust Account. Check No. 3934.
04/16/2014Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Janet L. Chubb.14-12289
04/18/2014Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.14-12627
04/30/2014Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for June 9, 2014 at 2:00 p.m.14-13986
05/21/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Law Firm. Settlement Judge Janet Chubb.14-16528
05/27/2014Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Other Amended Early Case Assessment Report. Counsel has requested recusal of the settlement judge. Settlement conference set for June 9th is vacated.14-17106
06/02/2014Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Settlement Judge Reassignment. Issued Amended Notice of Assignment to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. New Settlement Judge: Carol Webster Millie.14-17824
07/02/2014Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for August 12, 2014 at 10 am.14-21670
08/18/2014Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.14-27061
08/25/2014Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix.14-28023
09/04/2014Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 2/24/14. To Court Reporter: Stephanie Koetting.14-29236
10/22/2014MotionFiled Stipulation Enlarging Time for Appellant to File Opening Brief.14-35156
10/22/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief due: December 22, 2014.14-35233
12/19/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix, Vol. 1.14-41496
12/19/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix, Vol. 2.14-41497
12/19/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix, Vol. 3, Pt. 1.14-41498
12/19/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix, Vol. 4, Pt. 1.14-41500
12/19/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix, Vol. 5, Pt. 1.14-41501
12/19/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix, Vol. 6, Pt. 1.14-41502
12/19/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix, Vol. 7.14-41503
12/19/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix, Vol. 8.14-41504
12/19/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix, Vol. 9.14-41505
12/22/2014BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.14-41772
01/12/2015MotionFiled Stipulation Extending Time for Filing and Serving of Respondent's Answering Brief.15-01211
01/12/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved Answering Brief due date: February 19, 2015.15-01263
02/19/2015BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.15-05389
03/20/2015MotionFiled Stipulation Enlarging Time for Appellant to File Reply Brief.15-08626
03/31/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Stipulation . Reply Brief due: April 6, 2015.15-09709
04/06/2015BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.15-10239
04/06/2015Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
04/06/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Errata to Appellant's Reply Brief.15-10249
09/25/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Re: Scheduling Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.15-29110
10/02/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Tuesday, November 3, 2015, at 10:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City.15-30022
10/21/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.15-32047
11/03/2015Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
06/30/2016Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Pickering, J. Majority: Pickering/Parraguirre/Hardesty/Douglas/Cherry/Saitta/Gibbons.132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 48. EN BANC16-20462
07/18/2016Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for Rehearing.16-22259
07/18/2016Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Mark D. Wray
08/03/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Respondent's Answer due: 15 days.16-24006
08/18/2016Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent's Answer to Appellant's Petition for Rehearing.16-25681
08/24/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Issued Letter to Publishers regarding corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 58101/67835/67519/65598/67786/65364 (Document entered in case no. 58101 document no. 16-26404.)
09/16/2016Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "We therefore deny rehearing under NRAP 40(c)." Fn1[The honorable Nancy M. Saitta, Justice, having retired, this petition for rehearing was decided by a six-justice court.]16-28822
10/11/2016RemittiturIssued Remittitur.16-31551
10/11/2016Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/14/2016RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 12, 2016.16-31551