The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 65388
Short Caption:TAYLOR (DONALD) VS. STATEClassification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C270343Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: En Banc
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:09/09/2015 at 11:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:09/09/2015How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/10/2014Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
04/10/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)14-11500
04/10/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Criminal. Due date: 10 days14-11502
04/21/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Filing Case Appeal Statement.14-12723
04/29/2014Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request.14-13821
07/31/2014MotionFiled Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix.14-25089
08/07/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: September 22, 2014.14-25950
09/12/2014MotionFiled Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Opening Brief.14-30341
09/25/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant: Opening Brief and Appendix due: November 6, 2014.14-31894
11/04/2014AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Vol 1.14-36526
11/04/2014AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Vol 2.14-36527
11/04/2014AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Vol 3.14-36528
11/04/2014AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Vol 4.14-36539
11/04/2014AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Vol 5.14-36540
11/05/2014MotionFiled Motion to Exceed the Page Limit for Appellant's Opening Brief. (Opening Brief attached as an Exhibit).14-36547
11/05/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Appellant's Appendix, Vol 614-36548
11/05/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Appellant's Appendix, Vol 714-36549
11/07/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We decline to file the proposed opening brief submitted with the motion. Appellant's opening brief that complies with NRAP 32 and does not exceed 14,951 words due: November 14, 2014.14-36835
11/13/2014BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.14-37448
12/16/2014BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.14-40876
01/09/2015MotionFiled Motion for Enlargement of Time.15-00951
01/09/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due date: January 30, 2015.15-01089
01/29/2015MotionFiled Motion for Enlargement of Time (Second Request).15-03156
01/29/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due: February 13, 2015.15-03158
02/09/2015BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.15-04110
02/09/2015Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
03/02/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein.15-06449
06/11/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Re: Scheduling Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.15-17860
08/06/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Wednesday, September 9, 2015, at 11:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City.15-23771
08/26/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.15-25867
09/09/2015Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. To the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP15-NS/KP/MG.
04/21/2016Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before: Hardesty/Saitta/Pickering. Author: Saitta, J. Majority: Saitta/Hardesty/Pickering. 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 27. SNP16-JH/NS/KP16-12414
05/05/2016Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing.16-14074
06/10/2016Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c).16-18197
06/20/2016Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for En Banc Reconsideration.16-19294
07/14/2016Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC16-22047
08/08/2016RemittiturIssued Remittitur.16-24414
08/08/2016Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/08/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter dated June 30, 2016 to Publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 66816/(59691/68304)/66888/65193/65388/(67756/67763)/68476/63178/62720/64281 (Letter entered in 66816 as document no. 16-24439.)
08/19/2016RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 11, 2016.16-24414
10/18/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from US Supreme Court/Certiorari Filed. A petition for a writ of certiorari was filed October 12, 2016 and placed on the docket as Case No. 16-507.16-32477
01/13/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from US Supreme Court/Certiorari Denied. The petition for a writ of certiorari is denied.17-01482