Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 65429
Short Caption:STATE VS. BEAUDION (EARL)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C293030Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Pretrial
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:03/10/2015 at 10:10 AMOral Argument Location:Bishop Manogue
Submission Date:03/10/2015How Submitted:After Oral Argument
Expedited

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/15/2014Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
04/15/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Filed certified copy of notice of appeal. (Fast Track Notice issued to counsel for appellant.)14-12111
04/15/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Request Rough Draft Transcripts. Due date: 10 days.14-12114
04/16/2014Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request.14-12236
05/27/2014MotionFiled Motion for Extension on Time to File FTS.14-17032
06/05/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: June 26, 2014.14-18258
06/26/2014Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement.14-21062
06/26/2014AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix.14-21063
07/16/2014MotionFiled Motion for Extension to File Fast Track Response.14-23104
07/24/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent shall have until August 29, 2014, to file and serve the fast track response.14-24103
08/27/2014MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Fast Track Response.14-28308
09/12/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Fast Track Response due: October 14, 2014.14-30311
10/14/2014Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response.14-34075
10/20/2014Fast Track BriefFiled Reply to Fast Track Response.14-34747
10/20/2014Case Status UpdateFast Track Briefing Completed.
01/28/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.15-02977
02/04/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled Tuesday, March 10, 2015, at 10:30 a.m. at Bishop Manogue. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes.15-03786
02/05/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Corrected Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled Tuesday, March 10, 2015, at 10:10 a.m. at Bishop Manogue. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes.15-03898
02/27/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.15-06333
03/06/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from Marc Myrehn, a teacher at Bishop Manogue requesting to film and broadcast oral argument, held on March 10, 2015, at Bishop Manogue Catholic High School.15-06974
03/06/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Media Request. Permission is granted for photographic or electronic media coverage of the aforesaid matters. Marc Myrehn of Bishop Manogue Catholic High School is designated as pool coordinator. All equipment necessary to allow for such photographic or electronic coverage shall be in place and tested in the area of the school designated to serve as a courtroom no later than 8:55 a.m. before commencement of the hearings. Nos. 63943/65429.15-07073
03/10/2015BriefFiled Appellant's Notice of Supplemental Authorities.15-07394
03/10/2015Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. To the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP15-NS/MG/KP.
07/02/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and Remanded." Before Saitta, Gibbons, and Pickering, JJ. Author: Pickering. Majority: Saitta/Gibbons/Pickering. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 48. NNP1515-20196
07/27/2015RemittiturIssued Remittitur.15-22612
07/27/2015Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/10/2015RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 31, 2015.15-22612
11/17/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter (dated 11/10/15) to Publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 65429/64539/62792/62059 (Letter entered in 64539 as document no. 15-901390)