Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 65460
Short Caption:TATE, JR., M.D. VS. NEV. STATE BD. MEDICAL EXAM'RCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):65421, 73510
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A697512Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:09/10/2014 at 11:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:09/10/2014How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/18/2014Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal.
04/18/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.14-12632
04/18/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.14-12641
04/18/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Case Appeal Statement. Corrected case appeal statement due: 10 days.14-12643
04/18/2014Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Jacob L. Hafter.
04/18/2014MotionFiled Emergency Motion for Injunctive Relief Pursuant to NRAP 8.14-12657
04/18/2014ExhibitFiled Exhibits (copies). Exhibits to Emergency Motion for Injunctive Relief part 1.14-12661
04/18/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (Docketing Statement mailed to Apppellant counsel)14-12663
04/21/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Revised Case Appeal Statement.14-12664
04/21/2014Order/IncomingFiled District court order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on April 18, 2014. (Order Denying Request for Preliminary Injunction and Vacating Temporary Restraining Order.)14-12714
04/21/2014Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant(s) 15 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief:14-12757
04/21/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Partial Temporary Stay, Removing Appeal from Settlement Program, and Setting Expedited Briefing Schedule. We grant a partial temporary stay of the district court's order denying injunctive relief pending receipt and consideration of any opposition to the motion. The temporary stay shall apply to the suspension of appellant's license only. We necessarily extend the district court's temporary restraining order as to the suspension of appellant's license further order of this court. We enter no stay as to the reporting of disciplinary action to the NPDB. We remove this appeal from this court's settlement program. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: 15 days. Respondent's answering brief due: 15 days. Appellant's reply brief due: 5 days. No extensions of time to the briefing schedule will be granted. For purposes of filings directed by this order, we suspend application of NRAP 25(a)(2)(B)(ii)-(iv). All documents submitted in response to this order shall be filed personally, electronically, or by facsimile transmission with the clerk of this court in Carson City. Service of all documents shall be personal, electronic, or by fax. Pickering, J., concurring.14-12807
04/22/2014TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter Dana J. Tavaglione stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 4/14/14.14-12897
04/23/2014Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.14-13158
04/24/2014MotionFiled Nevada State Board of Medical Examiners Opposition to Emergency Motion for Injunctive Relief.14-13291
05/06/2014BriefFiled Appellants' Opening Brief.14-14633
05/06/2014AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 1.14-14634
05/06/2014AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 2.14-14635
05/19/2014BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.14-16295
08/01/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled Wednesday, September 10, 2014, at 11:30 a.m. in Carson City. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes.14-25258
08/26/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.14-28209
09/10/2014Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
09/23/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent Nevada State Board of Medical Examiners Substitution of Counsel, Erin L. Albright, Esq., in place and stead of Bradley O. Van Ry, Esq. as attorney of record. (Inadvertently submitted in the wrong case number)14-31570
09/24/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent Nevada State Board of Medical Examiners Substitution of Counsel, Erin L. Albright, Esq., in place and stead of Bradley O. Van Ry, Esq. as attorney of record.14-31681
09/10/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Hardesty, C.J. Majority: Hardesty/Parraguirre/Douglas/Cherry/Saitta/Gibbons/Pickering. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 67. EN BANC15-27329
09/25/2015MotionFiled Motion for Attorneys Fees.15-29032
09/25/2015MotionFiled Motion Bill of Costs.15-29033
10/01/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Ntice of Withdrawal of Motion for Attorneys Fees and Bill of Costs15-29785
10/05/2015RemittiturIssued Remittitur.15-30203
10/05/2015Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/20/2015RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 8, 2015.15-30203