The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 65498
Short Caption:VU (PHONG) VS. DIST. CT. (GAMMICK)Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - FV0703179ACase Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: En Banc
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:03/03/2015 at 1:30 PMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:03/03/2015How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/24/2014Filing FeePetition Filing fee waived. State/County/Municipality.
04/24/2014Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus.14-13205
04/24/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ.14-13206
05/05/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer. Real Party in Interest's Answer due: 30 days. Any reply from petitioner due: 15 days from service of the answer.14-14455
06/05/2014Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus.14-18267
06/11/2014Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Reply to Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus.14-19048
12/09/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.14-40023
01/28/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled Tuesday, March 3, 2015, at 1:30 p.m. in Carson City. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes.15-03072
02/18/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.15-05216
03/02/2015Notice/OutgoingFiled Disclosure. Chief Justice Hardesty disclosing basis for disqualification. If the parties and counsel wish to waive disqualification, they shall file a written waiver prior to 9:00 a.m. on Tuesday, March 3, 2015.15-06402
03/02/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Waiver of Disqualification.15-06433
03/02/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Waiver of Disqualification.15-06436
03/02/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice Washoe County District Attorney's Waiver of Disqualification15-06504
03/03/2015Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
04/08/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Responsible Attorney (Herbert Kaplan to replace Blaine Cartlidge as counsel for the Real Party in Interest).15-10575
07/10/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Supplemental Briefing. Petitioner's Supplemental Brief due: 10 days. Real Party in Interest shall have 10 days from the date petitioner serves his supplemental brief to file and serve a response. Petitioner may file a reply of no more than 5 pages within 5 days of the date that real party in interest serves a response. Unless otherwise indicated, all briefs shall comply with the page-length/type-volume limits on reply merits briefs.15-21052
07/20/2015BriefFiled Petitioner's Supplemental Brief.15-21782
08/03/2015BriefFiled Response to Supplemental Brief Regarding Standard of Review.15-23289
08/04/2015BriefFiled Petitioner's Supplemental Reply Brief.15-23535
03/31/2016Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition denied." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Parraguirre, C.J. Majority: Parraguirre/Hardesty/Douglas/Cherry/Gibbons. Pickering, j., with whom Saitta, J., agrees, dissenting. 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 21. EN BANC16-10015
04/25/2016RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.16-12846
04/25/2016Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.