The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 65562
Short Caption:HUMBOLDT GENERAL HOSP. VS. DIST. CT. (BARRETT)Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus
Lower Court Case(s):Humboldt Co. - Sixth Judicial District - CV 19460Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: En Banc
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:06/30/2015 at 11:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:06/30/2015How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/02/2014Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from Mark J Lenz.
05/02/2014Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus.14-14259
05/02/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ of Mandamus.14-14260
05/02/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Declaration re Petition for Writ of Mandamus.14-14299
05/13/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer. Real parties in interest's answer due: 30 days. Petitioner: 15 days to file any reply.14-15529
06/17/2014Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ - Answer in Opposition to Writ of Mandate.14-19827
06/23/2014Petition/WritFiled Reply in Support of Writ of Mandamus.14-20544
11/19/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Counsel. Petitioners Humboldt General Hospital and Sharon McIntyre, M.D. hereby substitutes Dominique A. Pollara of Schuering Zimmerman & Doyle, as their attorney of record in the place and stead of Margo Piscevich of Piscevich & Fenner.14-38199
04/16/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of law firm, Dominique A. Pollara.15-11498
05/28/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order re: Scheduling Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.15-16223
06/01/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Monday, June 29, 2015, at 10:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City.15-16566
06/15/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.15-18158
06/16/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Plaintiff's Notice of Change of Mailing Address and Facsimile Number. (David Allen, Esq.)15-18321
06/16/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Scheduling Conflict Re Date of Oral Argument.15-18401
06/17/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Real Party In Interest's Counsel's Availability for Oral Argument.15-18590
06/18/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. The oral argument presently scheduled for June 29, 2015, at 10:30 a.m. is hereby vacated. The clerk of this court will schedule this petition for oral argument before the en banc court on June 30, 2015, at 11:30 a.m., in Carson City. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes.15-18728
06/22/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Plaintiff's Counsel Availability for Oral Argument.15-19041
06/30/2015Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
07/28/2016Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition granted." Direct the clerk of this court to issue a writ of mandamus instructing the district court to set aside its earlier order, and grant Humboldt's and Dr. McIntyre's motion to dismiss in its entirety. Before the Court En Banc. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Parraguirre/Douglas/Cherry/Saitta/Gibbons/Pickering.132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 53. EN BANC16-23417
07/28/2016WritIssued Writ with letter. Original and one copy of writ and copy of Opinion mailed to Attorney Dominique A. Pollara for service upon Judge Michael Montero.16-23541
08/22/2016RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.16-25945
08/22/2016Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/26/2016WritFiled Returned Writ. Original Writ returned. Served on Judge Michael Montero on August 9, 2016.16-26633
11/07/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter to Publishers regarding Corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 67656/64349;64452;65497/64702;65007;65172/65562/66697/66157/67660/56329/69169 (Filed in docket no. 67656 document no. 16-34632)