Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 65580
Short Caption:THE D VS. MOGGCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):55818
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A681004Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:05/12/2014 / Harris, RichardSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/06/2014Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court.
05/06/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)14-14544
05/06/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.14-14546
05/09/2014Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Lewis Bisgaard & Smith, LLP. Check No. 103020.
05/12/2014Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Richard A. Harris.14-15124
05/27/2014Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals 65580 on Gary Mogg.14-17143
06/09/2014Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for Thursday, September 11, 2014, 9:00 a.m.14-18687
09/15/2014Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.14-30507
09/17/2014Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellants: 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix.14-30811
10/03/2014Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request.14-32863
12/17/2014MotionFiled Stipulation and Order Extending Briefing Schedule.14-41055
12/18/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief due date: January 5, 2015.14-41181
01/08/2015MotionFiled Appellants' Request for Voluntary Dismissal of Appeal.15-00773
01/09/2015Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Cause Appearing, appellants' motion for a voluntary dismissal of this appeal is granted. "This appeal is dismissed." Case Closed/No Remittitur Issued. NNP-MP15-00900