Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 65596
Short Caption:CASHMAN EQUIP. CO. VS. BROMLEY C/W 66257Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:65596*, 66257Related Case(s):66257, 66876
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A647859Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:05/12/2014 / Turner, WilliamSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/07/2014Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court.
05/07/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)14-14736
05/07/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.14-14740
05/09/2014MotionFiled Appellants' Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) to Stay Proceedings Against Appellants Pending Resolution of Appeal.14-15061
05/09/2014Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Lincoln Gustafson & Cercos. Check No. 10119.
05/12/2014MotionFiled Opposition to Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) to Stay Proceedings Against Appellants Pending Resolution of Appeal.14-15335
05/12/2014Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William C. Turner.14-15343
05/13/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Show Cause and Denying Stay. Appellants shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Respondent may file any reply within 11 days from the date that appellants' response is served.14-15526
06/11/2014MotionFiled Appellants' Response to Order to Show Cause.14-19212
06/18/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on all parties and the Settlement Judge.14-20075
06/19/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service of Appellants' Response to Order to Show Cause.14-20280
07/07/2014Docketing StatementFiled Response to Docketing Statement.14-21944
07/18/2014Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference has not been scheduled yet (working on a mutual time with counsel in August).14-23462
07/21/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Allowing Appeal to Proceed. Briefing remains suspended. Docketing Statement due: 11 days.14-23485
07/23/2014Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: August 14, 2014 at 1:30 p.m.14-23974
07/25/2014Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.14-24291
08/04/2014Docketing StatementFiled Response to Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.14-25467
08/15/2014MotionFiled Motion to Consolidate Related Appeals. Nos. 65596/66257.14-26881
09/02/2014Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/Settlement. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. Nos. 65596/66257.14-28847
01/05/2015Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We grant Phillip Matthew Bromley's motion to consolidate these appeals for all appellate purposes. Pursuant to NRAP 16, the settlement judge has filed a report with this court indicating that the parties have agreed to a settlement. Accordingly, the parties shall have ten days from the date of this order to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss these consolidated appeals or otherwise inform this court of the status of this matter. Fn1 [We note that there is also a related original writ proceeding pending before this court, Breeden v. Dist. Ct., Docket No. 66876. It does not appear that dismissal of these consolidated appeals will have any effect on that matter.] Nos. 65596/66257.15-00183
01/08/2015MotionFiled Stipulation to Dismiss Appeals. Nos. 65596/66257.15-00874
01/12/2015Settlement Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal/Stipulation/Settlement. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, "this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). Case Closed/No Remittitur Issued. Nos. 65596/66257.15-01216