Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 65632
Short Caption:WATSON ROUNDS, P.C. VS. DIST. CT. (HIMELFARB & ASSOC., LLC)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):64427, 69747, 72930
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A645734Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/21/2015How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/12/2014Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Lemons, Grundy & Eisenberg. Check no. 28618.
05/12/2014Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus.14-15182
05/12/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 1. (CD attached)14-15185
05/12/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 2.14-15186
05/12/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 3.14-15187
05/12/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 4.14-15189
06/05/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Real Parties in Interest's Answer due: 30 days. Petitioner shall have 15 days from service of the answer to file and serve any reply.14-18255
07/08/2014Petition/WritFiled Real Parties in Interest Bruce Himelfarb and Himelfarb & Associates, LLC's Opposition to Watson Rounds' Petition for Writ of Mandamus.14-22050
07/08/2014AppendixFiled Real Parties in Interest Bruce Himelfarb and Himelfarb & Associates, LLC's Appendix Vol. 1.14-22054
07/08/2014AppendixFiled Real Parties in Interest Bruce Himelfarb and Himelfarb & Associates, LLC's Appendix Vol. 2.14-22055
07/08/2014AppendixFiled Real Parties in Interest Bruce Himelfarb and Himelfarb & Associates, LLC's Appendix Vol. 4.14-22056
07/08/2014AppendixFiled Real Parties in Interest Bruce Himelfarb and Himelfarb & Associates, LLC's Appendix Vol. 5.14-22057
07/08/2014AppendixFiled Real Parties in Interest Bruce Himelfarb and Himelfarb & Associates', LLC's Appendix Vol. 3.14-22073
07/23/2014Petition/WritFiled Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus.14-23960
07/23/2014AppendixFiled Supplemental Appendix to Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus - Vol. 5.14-23961
07/23/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Erratum to Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus.14-24043
07/31/2014MotionFiled Real Parties in Interest Bruce Himelfarb and Himelfarb & Associates, LLC's Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply.14-25131
08/11/2014MotionFiled Petitioner's Response to Himelfarb Parties' Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply.14-26255
09/11/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion to File Sur-Reply. We direct the clerk of this court to return, unfiled, the proposed sur-reply provisionally received in this court on July 31, 2014 along with the related supplemental appendix which was provisionally received in this court on August 4, 2014.14-30166
05/21/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision without Oral Argument.15-15698
09/24/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition granted." We grant the petition and direct the clerk of this court to issue a writ of mandamus instructing the district court to vacate the portion of its September 9, 2013, order holding Watson Rounds, P.C., jointly and severally liable for Himelfarb's attorney fees and costs. Before the Court En Banc. Author: Parraguirre, J. Majority: Parraguirre/Hardesty/Douglas/Cherry/Saitta/Gibbons/Pickering. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 79. EN BANC15-28893
09/24/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Correcting Opinion. On September 24, 2015, this court issued an opinion granting this petition for a writ of mandamus. In the first sentence of the last paragraph of the opinion, we erroneously direct the clerk to issue the writ instructing the district court to vacate a portion of its "September 9, 2013, order." The district court's order was in fact entered on "September 19, 2013." To correct this error, we direct the clerk of this court to delete the first sentence of the last paragraph and replace it with the following sentence: "Accordingly, our intervention is warranted, and we grant the petition and direct the clerk of this court to issue a writ of mandamus instructing the district court to vacate the portion of its September 19, 2013, order holding Watson Rounds, P.C., jointly and severally liable for Himelfarb's attorney fees and costs."15-29002
09/24/2015WritIssued Writ with letter. Original and one copy of writ and copy of opinion mailed to Robert L. Eisenber for service upon Judge Elizabeth Goff Gonzalez.15-29006
09/30/2015WritFiled Returned Writ. Original Writ returned. Served on Judge Elizabeth Goff Gonzalez on September 28, 2015.15-29698
10/19/2015RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.15-31754
10/19/2015Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/10/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter dated February 8, 2016, to publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 62059/(61103/61640)/62745/63737/64881/65273/64214/61131/(60673/61390)/62061/64130/64484/65064/65632/66346/59685/(61305/61871)/(61324/63258)/65335/54389/64569 (Letter entered in 62059 as document no. 16-04455.)