Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 65666
Short Caption:DOUBLE DIAMOND RANCH MASTER ASS'N VS. DIST. CT. (THE CITY OF RENO, NEV.)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV1302239Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/22/2015How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/14/2014Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from John M. Samberg.
05/14/2014Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus and/or Prohibition.14-15764
05/14/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ.14-15767
06/03/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Real Party in Interest's Answer due: 30 days. Petitioner shall have 15 days from service of the answer to file and serve any reply.14-18025
06/23/2014MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer Petition for Writ of Mandamus and/or Prohibition.14-20530
07/01/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Approving Stipulation for Extension of Time. Real Party in Interest's Answer due: July 25, 2014.14-21485
07/25/2014Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ14-24352
08/01/2014MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Filing Time of Reply Brief.14-25202
08/18/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Approving Stipulation. Petitioner's Reply due: September 8, 2014.14-27099
09/03/2014Petition/WritFiled Reply Brief in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus and/or Prohibition.14-29150
01/22/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision without Oral Argument.15-02442
07/30/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition denied." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Hardesty, C.J. Majority: Hardesty/Parraguirre/Douglas/Saitta/Gibbons. Pickering, J., with whom Cherry, J., agrees, concurring. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 57.15-22992
08/24/2015RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.15-25551
08/24/2015Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.