The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 65681
Short Caption:STATE, DEPT. OF EMPLOYMENT SECURITY DIV. VS. MURPHYClassification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A689756Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: En Banc
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:05/22/2014 / Trost, JanetSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/09/2015How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/16/2014Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. State/County/Municipality.
05/16/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)14-16019
05/16/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.14-16021
05/22/2014Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Salvatore C. Gugino.14-16674
06/03/2014Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.14-18047
07/09/2014Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: ECAR. Issued Notice to Settlement Judge Salvatore Gugino to file Early Case Assessment Report.14-22219
07/15/2014Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. It is respectfully requested that this case this case be reassigned.14-22909
07/17/2014Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Settlement Judge Reassignment. Issued Amended Notice of Assignment to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. New Settlement Judge: Janet Trost.14-23213
07/24/2014Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for July 28, 2014, at 3:15 p.m.14-24230
08/04/2014Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.14-25453
08/06/2014Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix.14-25692
09/22/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Request Transcripts. Due date: 10 days.14-31382
09/24/2014Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request.14-31738
11/05/2014BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.14-36622
11/05/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Joint Appendix.14-36624
12/08/2014BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.14-39776
01/06/2015MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Reply Brief.15-00294
01/06/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice - Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due: February 6, 2015.15-00304
02/06/2015BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.15-04008
02/09/2015Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
05/21/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address and Telephone Numbers; And, Notice of Change of Attorney of Record for Nevada Employment Security Division. Neil A. Rombardo, Esq., Division Senior Attorney for Nevada Employment Security Division, for the Respondent.15-15728
10/09/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and it shall stand submitted on the record and briefs filed herein, as of the date of this order.15-30709
12/17/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Attorney of Record for Appellant Nevada Department of Employment, Training and Rehabilitation, Employment Security Division.15-38685
03/31/2016Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Parraguirre/Douglas/Cherry/Saitta/Gibbons/Pickering. 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 18. EN BANC16-10009
04/15/2016Letter/IncomingFiled Letter from Employment Security Division.16-11938
04/25/2016RemittiturIssued Remittitur.16-12855
04/25/2016Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/03/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter to Sheri Ihler in response to letter filed on 4/15/16, regarding counsel for appellants on the advance sheets for an opinion.16-13804
05/10/2016RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on April 29, 2016.16-12855
05/12/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter (dated 5/3/16) to Publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 65424/66816/67465/53626/62493/69580/65681/66473 (Letter entered in Docket No. 65424 as document no. 16-14923.)