Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 65728
Short Caption:RIMER (COLLEN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):54555, 57454, 58711, 58896, 65727, 69326, 69510, 70352, 71451, 71855, 71856, 71857, 71857-COA, 73187, 73693, 73693-COA, 73781, 73781-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C246300Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/22/2014Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
05/22/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.14-16764
06/12/2014Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP14-KP/RP/NS14-19369
07/11/2014RemittiturIssued Remittitur.14-22594
07/11/2014Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed
07/25/2014RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 16, 2014.14-22594