The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 65755
Short Caption:TOWER HOMES, LLC VS. HEATONClassification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Related Case(s):62252
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A663341Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: Panel
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:07/10/2014 / Shirinian, AraSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:02/10/2016 at 1:30 PMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:02/10/2016How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/29/2014Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the district court.
05/29/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)14-17386
05/29/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.14-17388
06/04/2014Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Prince & Keating, LLP. Check No. 57620.
06/18/2014Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.14-20136
07/10/2014Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: James J. Jimmerson.14-22397
08/04/2014Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for October 7, 2014 at 9:00 a.m.14-25431
08/14/2014Letter/IncomingFiled Letter from James J. Jimmerson recusing himself as settlement judge in this matter.14-26742
08/15/2014Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Settlement Judge Reassignment. Issued Amended Notice of Assignment to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. New Settlement Judge: Ara H. Shirinian.14-26967
08/25/2014Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 10/7/14 @ 10:00 a.m.14-28053
10/10/2014Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.14-33754
10/15/2014Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix.14-34173
11/03/2014Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 3/21/14. To Court Reporter: Kerry Esparza.14-36209
01/12/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Opening Brief and Appendix due: January 21, 2015.15-01226
01/21/2015MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief (14 days).15-02239
01/21/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief and Appendix due: February 4, 2015.15-02252
02/05/2015AppendixFiled Tower Homes, LLC's Appendix Volume 1.15-03857
02/05/2015AppendixFiled Tower Homes, LLC's Appendix Volume 2.15-03858
02/05/2015AppendixFiled Tower Homes, LLC's Appendix Volume 3.15-03859
02/05/2015AppendixFiled Tower Homes, LLC's Appendix Volume 4.15-03860
02/05/2015AppendixFiled Tower Homes, LLC's Appendix Volume 5.15-03861
02/05/2015AppendixFiled Tower Homes, LLC's Appendix Volume 6.15-03862
02/09/2015BriefFiled Tower Homes, LLC's Opening Brief.15-04148
02/09/2015AppendixFiled Tower Homes, LLC's Appendix Master Alphabetical Index.15-04149
03/10/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Answering Brief due: March 18, 2015.15-07435
03/18/2015BriefFiled Respondents' Answering Brief.15-08310
03/18/2015AppendixFiled Respondents' Appendix.15-08313
04/16/2015MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time for Appellant Tower Homes LLC to File Reply Brief.15-11432
04/16/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due: May 18, 2015.15-11436
05/15/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Firm Name (Prince and Keating has been changed to Keating Law Group).15-14925
05/15/2015MotionFiled Tower Homes, LLC's Motion for an Extension of Time to File Reply Brief.15-15003
05/26/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Reply Brief due: June 26, 2015.15-15906
06/26/2015BriefFiled Appellant Tower Homes, LLC's Reply Brief.15-19641
06/26/2015Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
12/07/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.15-37242
12/10/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Wednesday, February 10, 2016, at 1:30 pm for 30 minutes in Las Vegas.15-37757
01/29/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.16-03087
02/10/2016Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP16-JH/NS/KP.
08/12/2016Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before: Hardesty/Saitta/Pickering. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Saitta/Pickering. 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 62. SNP16-JH/NS/KP16-25002
09/07/2016RemittiturIssued Remittitur.16-27779
09/07/2016Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/23/2016RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on September 13, 2016.16-27779