Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 65777
Short Caption:GARCIA (RAMON) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):42403, 44006, 47059, 48123, 56137, 62119, 65158, 69458, 70604, 70604-COA, 71005, 71005-COA, 71006, 71006-COA, 80987, 80988
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C178581Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:DouglasCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/17/2014How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/02/2014Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
06/02/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.14-17767
06/02/2014OtherJustice Michael L. Douglas disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Sat in District Court Proceedings
06/12/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record. Record due from district court clerk: 45 days.14-19329
07/17/2014Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volumes 1-11. Via FTP.14-23229
07/17/2014Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision
07/24/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk. Pre-Sentence Investigation Report (SEALED).
10/15/2014Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP14-KP/RP/NS.14-34336
11/12/2014RemittiturIssued Remittitur.14-37171
11/12/2014Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed
11/25/2014RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on November 19, 2014.14-37171