Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 65796
Short Caption:TIRIKOS VS. DIST. CT. (STATE)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - J329214Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/03/2014Filing FeePetition Filing fee waived. In Forma Pauperis.
06/03/2014Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or, in the Alternative, Writ of Prohibition.14-17957
06/03/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ.14-17958
06/03/2014MotionFiled Emergency Motion for Stay of Proceedings14-17969
06/04/2014MotionFiled Opposition to Emergency Motion for Stay of Proceedings.14-18085
06/04/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion for Stay.14-18250
06/26/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Supplement. Petitioner shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file and serve a supplement to the petition informing this court of the result of the June 5, 2014, trial.14-20994
07/11/2014Petition/WritFiled Supplement to Petition for Writ of Mandamus, or, In the Alternative, Writ of Prohibition.14-22649
07/16/2014Petition/WritFiled Second Supplement to Petition for Writ of Mandamus.14-23103
07/18/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer. Real party interest's answer to writ petition due: 30 days. Petitioner: 15 days to file any reply.14-23441
08/21/2014Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ.14-27560
09/05/2014Petition/WritFiled Reply to Answer to Petition -Petitioner's Reply Brief.14-29506
11/20/2014Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." NNP14-KP/RP/NS14-38330
12/03/2014Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for Rehearing.14-39326
12/18/2014Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c).14-41306
12/31/2014Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for En Banc Reconsideration.14-42533
03/03/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Real Party in Interest's Answer due: 15 days.15-06650
03/18/2015Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration.15-08259
06/24/2015Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Granting Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. This matter is submitted for decision on reconsideration without further briefing or oral argument.15-19256
09/24/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition denied." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Parraguirre, J. Majority: Parraguirre/Hardesty/Douglas/Cherry/Saitta/Gibbons/Pickering. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 77. EN BANC.15-28885
10/19/2015RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.15-31761
10/19/2015Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.