Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 65833
Short Caption:BENSON VS. STATE ENGINEERCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Eureka Co. - Seventh Judicial District - CV 1310-207Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:05/05/2015 at 11:00 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:05/05/2015How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/09/2014Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court.
06/09/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)14-18643
06/09/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.14-18647
06/09/2014Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Schroeder Law Offices. Check no. 24157.
06/10/2014Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant(s) 15 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief:14-18832
06/17/2014Transcript RequestFiled Certificate That No Transcript is Being Requested.14-19864
07/01/2014Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.14-21381
10/03/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume 1.14-33013
10/03/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume 2.14-33021
10/03/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume 3.14-33038
10/03/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume 4.14-33039
10/08/2014BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.14-33492
11/05/2014MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief.14-36559
11/05/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due: November 14, 2014.14-36572
11/13/2014BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.14-37529
12/15/2014BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.14-40752
12/15/2014Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
03/27/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.15-09381
03/30/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument scheduled for Tuesday, May 5, 2015, at 10:00 a.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City.15-09579
04/20/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.15-11774
05/05/2015Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
09/24/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Cherry, J. Majority: Cherry/Hardesty/Parraguirre/Douglas/Saitta/Gibbons/Pickeirng. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 78. EN BANC15-28890
09/28/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Attorney for Respondents (Justina Caviglia to Replace Jerry Snyder).15-29368
10/12/2015Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant Patti E. Benson's Petition for Rehearing.15-30955
10/12/2015Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Therese A. Ure.
11/05/2015Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c).15-33857
11/30/2015RemittiturIssued Remittitur.15-36244
11/30/2015Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/11/2015RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 2, 2015.15-36244