The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 65856
Short Caption:MANNING (JAMES) VS. STATEClassification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Direct
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C290624Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: En Banc
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:07/06/2016 at 11:30 AMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:07/06/2016How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/12/2014Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
06/12/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Filed certified copy of notice of appeal. (Fast Track Notice issued to counsel for appellant.)14-19399
06/26/2014TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Renee Vincent stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 11/1/13.14-21010
07/01/2014TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Kiara Schmidt stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 7/03/13.14-21432
07/14/2014TranscriptFiled Notice from Court ReporterJill Hawkins stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 8/12/13, 10/07/13, 11/13/13, 12/09/13, 12/30/13 and 1/06/1414-22773
07/22/2014MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time Due to Missing Transcripts (Fast Track Statement).14-23723
08/01/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's fast track statement and appendix due: 45 days.14-25177
08/01/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Re: Transcripts. Court reporters Sharon Howard and Robert Cangemi's certificate due: 14 days. Fn1[A copy of the transcript request form is attached.] Fn2[If either Ms. Howard or Mr. Cangemi believes she or he is not responsible for filing and delivering the requested transcripts, she or he shall inform this court in writing within 7 days from the date of this order.]14-25182
08/12/2014MotionFiled Reporter's Request For Extension For Preparation of Transcripts.14-26385
08/15/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion in Part and Regarding Briefing Schedule. Court Reporter Sharon Howard's Certficate of Delivery of Transcripts due: 40 days. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: 60 days.14-26849
08/18/2014TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Robert Cangemi stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 5/13/14.14-27067
10/10/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Conditionally Imposing Sanctions. Conditional sanction of $ 250 due: 15 days or Certificate of Delivery due: 11 days.14-33689
10/13/2014MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time Due to Missing Transcripts (Fast Track Statement).14-33960
10/16/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's fast track statement and appendix due: December 1, 2014.14-34441
10/23/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Payment of Sanction.14-35461
11/25/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order of Referral to Certified Court Reporters' Board of Nevada and Directing Court Reporter Sharon Howard to Appear Before This Court. We refer Ms. Howard to the certified court reporters' board of Nevada for disciplinary action. When the clerk of this court transmits a copy of this order to the board, the clerk shall include a copy of the docket sheet, transcript request form(s), and orders directed to Ms. Howard in each of these appeals. We order Ms. Howard to appear before this court at 4:30 p.m. on December 9, 2014, at the Regional Justice Center in Las Vegas, Nevada. Nos. 65136/65277/65856/65928/66324.14-38780
12/01/2014MotionFiled Motion for Extension of time to File FTS due to Missing Transcripts.14-39099
12/05/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: January 15, 2015.14-39709
12/15/2014TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Sharon Howard stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 1/13/14, 1/14/14, 1/15/14, 3/20/14 & 2/4/14.14-40840
01/14/2015MotionFiled Motion for Extension to File Fast Track Statement Due to Late Receipt of Transcripts.15-01440
01/23/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motions. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: March 2, 2015.15-02587
02/19/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement Volume I.15-05432
02/19/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement Volume II.15-05433
02/19/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement Volume III.15-05434
02/20/2015Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement.15-05496
02/24/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement - Vol. III, Pages 676 thru 679.
03/12/2015Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response.15-07742
03/19/2015Fast Track BriefFiled Reply to Fast Track Response.15-08383
03/19/2015Case Status UpdateFast Track Briefing Completed.
09/08/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this petition, and it shall stand submitted on the record and the briefs filed herein, as of the date of this order.15-27008
11/04/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Full Briefing. Opening Brief due: 30 days. Upon completion of briefing, the clerk of this court shall schedule this matter for oral argument before the en banc court on the next available calendar.15-33596
12/03/2015MotionFiled Stipulation to File Opening Brief.15-36929
12/03/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice - Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief due: January 4, 2016.15-36950
01/05/2016BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.16-00135
01/05/2016AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume IV.16-00136
02/03/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Tuesday, April 5, 2016, at 10:00 am for 30 minutes in Las Vegas.16-03668
02/04/2016MotionFiled Motion for Enlargement of Time. (Answering Brief)16-03764
02/17/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion and Rescheduling Oral Argument. Answering Brief due: March 21, 2016. The oral argument presently scheduled for April 5, 2016, at 10:00 a.m. is hereby vacated. This matter will be rescheduled for oral argument before the en banc court on the next available calendar.16-05130
03/22/2016BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.16-09083
04/21/2016MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Reply Brief.16-12639
04/21/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due: May 20, 2016.16-12642
05/19/2016BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.16-15883
05/24/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for Wednesday, July 6, 2016, at 11:30 a.m. in Las Vegas for 30 minutes.16-16290
06/23/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.16-19708
07/06/2016Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
09/15/2016Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Parraguirre, C.J. Majority: Parraguirre/Hardesty/Douglas/Cherry/Gibbons/Pickering. Fn1[The Honorable Nancy M. Saitta, Justice, having retired, this matter was decided by a six-justice court.] 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 67. EN BANC16-28613
10/10/2016RemittiturIssued Remittitur.16-31442
10/10/2016Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/27/2016RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 20, 2016.16-31442