The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 65985
Short Caption:KAR VS. KAR (CHILD CUSTODY)Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Pro Bono Program/Child Custody
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D441849Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: Panel
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:02/10/2016 at 10:30 AMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:02/10/2016How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/02/2014Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal.
07/02/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. Filed certified copy of proper person notice of appeal.14-21636
07/02/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.14-21647
07/08/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk. Confidential Civil Cover Sheet (SEALED).
07/21/2014Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Emily Stevens Sole Prop. DBA All States Paralegal Services. Check No. 3724.
07/22/2014Case Status UpdatePilot Program Civil Appeals. Order and documents mailed to proper person appellant. Civil proper person transcript request form due: 15 days. Civil proper person appeal statement due: 40 days.
08/14/2014Transcript RequestFiled Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form.14-26771
09/05/2014BriefFiled Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement.14-29476
09/05/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Copy of Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Appeal served on Respondent Kathleen Kar.14-29477
09/09/2014TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter Sherry Justice stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 5/22/14.14-29819
09/18/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record. Record due from district court clerk: 15 days.14-30928
09/23/2014Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 1.14-31563
09/23/2014Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision
10/20/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Pro Bono Counsel. We direct the clerk of this court to transmit a copy of this order and the attached case summary to the Legal Aid Center of Southern Nevada for financial eligibility screening. Notice of appearance for appellant and respondent due: 60 days. Financial eligibility screening from Legal Aid Center of Southern Nevada due: 60 days.14-34795
12/10/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance, Amberlea Davis, for the Appellant.14-40265
12/17/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Determination of Ineligibility for Pro Bono Representation.(Respondent)14-41052
12/29/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Transcripts and Setting Briefing Schedule. It appears that respondent will be proceeding without legal representation. Supplemental Transcript Request Form (optional) due: 14 days. Opening Brief and Appendix due: 90 days. Appellant shall state on the cover page whether it is a replacement brief or a supplement to the pro se appeal statement. Respondent's Answering Brief due: 30 days after service of the opening brief.14-42213
01/22/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Amanda M. Roberts and Robert Stoffel of Roberts Stoffel Family Law to Represent Respondent Kathleen Kar).15-02411
01/28/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Appearance of Counsel. On January 22, 2015, Amanda M. Roberts, Esq., and Jason P. Stoffel, Esq., of Roberts Stoffel Family Law Group filed a notice of appearance in this court as respondent's counsel. In accordance with the briefing schedule set forth in this court's December 29, 2014, order, respondent's counsel, rather than respondent, shall have 30 days after service of the opening brief to file and serve the answering brief. Because appellant is represented by pro bono counsel, this matter will be scheduled for oral argument upon completion of briefing, but either party's counsel may notify this court in writing if counsel believes that oral argument is undesirable or unnecessary.15-02993
04/15/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Opening Brief and Appendix due: 11 days. Answering Brief due: 30 days from service of opening brief. Reply Brief due: 10 days from service of answering brief.15-11339
05/19/2015MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Initial Brief (Opening Brief).15-15308
05/20/2015MotionFiled Respondent's Opposition to Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Initial Brief.15-15437
05/29/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion In Part. On May 19, 2015, appellant filed an untimely motion for an extension of time to file the opening brief. Respondent opposes the motion. Although appellant's counsel has repeatedly failed to comply with this court's rules and directives we, nevertheless, agree that a short extension is warranted. Opening Brief and Appendix due: 11 days.15-16423
06/09/2015BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.15-17560
06/09/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix.15-17561
07/06/2015BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief to Appellant's Opening Brief.15-20339
07/21/2015BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.15-21972
07/21/2015Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
12/10/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Wednesday, February 10, 2016, at 10:30 am for 30 minutes in Las Vegas.15-37755
01/29/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.16-03085
02/10/2016Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP16-JH/NS/KP.
02/17/2016MotionFiled Motion for Leave to file Amicus Curiae Brief.16-05037
02/19/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Firm Address. (Roberts Stoffel Family Law Group)16-05394
08/11/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Marshal S. Willick, Esq. of Willick Law Group has filed a motion for leave to file an amicus brief outside the time provided in NRAP 29(f). The motion is denied. The clerk of this court shall return, unfiled Willick's proposed amicus curiae brief received on February 17, 2016.16-24839
08/12/2016Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before: Hardesty/Saitta/Pickering. Author: Pickering, J. Majority: Pickering/Hardesty/Saitta. 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 63. SNP16-JH/NS/KP16-25006
09/07/2016RemittiturIssued Remittitur.16-27784
09/07/2016Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/23/2016RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on September 13, 2016.16-27784