The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 65998
Short Caption:WASHINGTON (MATTHEW) VS. STATEClassification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C294695Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: En Banc
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:04/13/2016 at 10:30 AMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:04/13/2016How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/03/2014Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
07/03/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.14-21770
07/21/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (Second NOA).14-23578
08/11/2014Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.14-26175
08/11/2014Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 12/23/13; 12/30/13; 1/13/14; 1/22/14; 1/29/14; 2/5/14; 3/5/14; 3/24/14; 4/2/14; 4/4/14; 4/7/14; 4/8/14; 4/9/14; 4/10/14; 4/11/14; 4/14/14; 4/15/14;4/16/14; 4/17/14; and 6/18/14. To Court Reporter: Kiara Schmidt; Sandra Pruchnic; Jill Hawkins; Beverly Sigurnik; and Patti Slattery.14-26177
09/09/2014TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter Jill Hawkins stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/20/13, 1/13/14, 1/22/14, 1/29/14, 2/05/14, 3/05/14, 3/24/14, 4/02/14, and 4/04/14.14-29824
09/29/2014TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Kiara Schmidt stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/23/13.14-32239
10/07/2014TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Beverly Sigurnik stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 4/7/14; 4/8/14; 4/9/14; 4/10/14; 4/11/14; 4/14/14; 4/15/14;4/16/14 & 6/18/14.14-33366
11/17/2014MotionFiled Stipulation to File Opening Brief.14-37902
11/17/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief due: December 18, 2014.14-37904
12/19/2014MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to file Opening Brief.14-41336
01/09/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: February 18, 2015.15-01002
02/19/2015MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time.15-05365
02/27/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion in Part. Opening Brief and Appendix due: April 20, 2015.15-06265
04/21/2015MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief.15-11995
04/24/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: June 1, 2015.15-12539
06/02/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume I.15-16726
06/02/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume II.15-16727
06/02/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume III.15-16728
06/02/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume IV.15-16729
06/02/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume V.15-16730
06/02/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume VI.15-16731
06/02/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume VII.15-16732
06/02/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume VIII.15-16733
06/02/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume IX.15-16734
06/02/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume X.15-16736
06/02/2015BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.15-16737
07/06/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Answering Brief due: July 10, 2015.15-20330
07/10/2015MotionFiled Motion for Enlargement of Time.15-21008
07/14/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: August 10, 2015.15-21403
08/06/2015BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.15-23781
08/26/2015MotionFiled Stipulation to File Reply Brief.15-25888
08/26/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due: October 8, 2015.15-25894
10/09/2015MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Eight Day Extension of Time to File Reply Brief.15-30682
10/13/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Reply Brief due: October 16, 2015.15-31074
10/19/2015BriefFiled Reply Brief.15-31674
10/19/2015Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
03/11/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Wednesday, April 13, 2016, at 10:30 am for 30 minutes in Las Vegas.16-07823
03/30/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.16-09905
04/13/2016Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP16-JH/NS/KP.
08/12/2016Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before: Hardesty/Saitta/Pickering. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Saitta/Pickering. 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 65. SNP16-JH/NS/KP16-25013
08/31/2016Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing.16-27042
09/16/2016Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). Fn1[The Honorable Nancy M. Saitta, Justice, having retired, did not participate in the decision of this matter.]16-28860
09/26/2016Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for En Banc Reconsideration.16-29883
11/23/2016Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC16-36503
12/19/2016RemittiturIssued Remittitur.16-39285
12/19/2016Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/12/2017RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on December 28, 2016.16-39285