Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 66080
Short Caption:MITCHELL (DEANGELO) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):37531, 37553, 40150, 42638, 44093, 46213, 46887, 51332, 53085, 62069, 62372, 66079, 66428, 66428-COA, 66773, 66773-COA, 69542, 70017, 70017-COA, 76899, 82127, 82127-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C156542Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/23/2014How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/16/2014Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
07/16/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.14-23075
07/24/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Entry and Transmission of Written Order. District Court Order due: 60 days.14-24126
07/30/2014Order/IncomingFiled District court order. Certified copy of Order Denying Defendant's Pro Per Motion to Correct Illegal Sentence filed in district court on 07/29/14.14-24816
08/13/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 60 days.14-26585
09/23/2014Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal volumes 1-18. Via FTP.14-31610
09/23/2014Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal pages 854-864 (SEALED).
09/23/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk. Pre-Sentence Investigation Report (SEALED).
09/23/2014Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
01/15/2015Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP15-RP/MD/MC.15-01708
03/11/2015Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c).15-07526
04/06/2015RemittiturIssued Remittitur.15-10231
04/06/2015Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/22/2015RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on April 14, 2015.15-10231