The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 66094
Short Caption:JOHNSON VS. WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASS'N.Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A655393Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: En Banc
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:07/28/2014 / Schofield, PaulSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:04/05/2016 at 1:30 PMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:04/05/2016How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/17/2014Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal.
07/17/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.14-23241
07/17/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.14-23243
07/17/2014Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Michael K. Wall
07/18/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days.14-23364
07/28/2014Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Paul H. Schofield.14-24479
08/22/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. Due date: 10 days.14-27815
08/25/2014Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for October 1, 2014.14-28049
08/25/2014Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. Notice to Appear.14-28051
08/25/2014Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.14-28090
01/16/2015MotionFiled Stipulation Re Settlement Program and Request for Briefing Schedule15-01828
01/27/2015Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties have filed a "Stipulation Re Settlement Program and Request for Briefing Schedule." Cause appearing, we approve the stipulation and reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix.15-02947
02/10/2015Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 02/07/14. To Court Reporter: Kerry Esparza.15-04343
04/22/2015MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief (First Request)15-12169
04/22/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief due date: May 27, 2015.15-12309
05/26/2015BriefFiled Appellant Lisa Johnson's Opening Brief.15-15965
05/26/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Appellant's Opening Brief - Volume I.15-15966
05/26/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Appellant's Opening Brief - Volume II.15-15967
05/26/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Appellant's Opening Brief - Volume III.15-15968
05/26/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Appellant's Opening Brief - Volume IV.15-15969
05/26/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Appellant's Opening Brief - Volume V.15-15970
05/26/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Appellant's Opening Brief - Volume VI.15-15971
05/26/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Appellant's Opening Brief - Volume VII.15-15972
06/19/2015MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief (First Request)15-18915
06/19/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due date: July 27, 2015.15-18917
07/22/2015MotionFiled Motionfor Extension of Time to File Answering Brief [Second Request].15-22274
07/23/2015MotionFiled Notice of Non-Opposition (Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief).15-22338
08/07/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: August 17, 2015.15-23861
08/18/2015BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.15-24880
09/15/2015MotionFiled Stipulation For Extension of Time to File Reply Brief (First Request).15-27977
09/15/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due date: October 16, 2015.15-27989
10/09/2015BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.15-30771
10/09/2015Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
02/10/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order to File Supplemental Appendix. Respondent's Sealed Supplemental Appendix due: 11 days. Upon receipt, the clerk of this court shall file the supplemental appendix under seal. fn1[In light of the circumstances, respondent is not required to serve the supplemental appendix on appellant.]16-04408
02/23/2016AppendixFiled - SEALED - Respondent's Supplemental Appendix.
02/24/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.16-05949
02/29/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Tuesday, April 5, 2016, at 1:30 p.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas.16-06482
03/21/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.16-08827
03/25/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance of Counsel, Michael B. Wixom, Esq. of the Law Offices of Smith Larsen & Wixom, for the Respondent Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.16-09449
04/05/2016Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
09/29/2016Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Douglas, J. Majority: Douglas/Parraguirre/Hardesty/Cherry/gibbons/Pickering. Fn1[The Honorable Nancy M. Saitta, Justice, having retired, this matter was decided by a six-justice court.] 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 70. EN BANC16-30274
10/24/2016RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned the sealed, respondent's appendix entered on 2/23/16 to Smith Larsen & Wixom with remittitur.16-33227
10/24/2016Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. Returned the sealed, respondent's appendix entered on 2/23/16 to Smith Larsen & Wixom with remittitur.
11/18/2016RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 31, 2016.16-33227
02/15/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter to Publishers regarding corrections on recently filed opinions. Nos. 68987/(61715/65819/66452)/66094/68434/(69611/70648)/(68523/68754/68770/68845)/(68949/68975)/69065/68033/69218 (Filed in Docket no. 68989, Document no. 17-05409)