Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 66101
Short Caption:D.R. HORTON, INC. VS. DIST. CT. (ARLINGTON RANCH HOMEOWNERS ASS'N.)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):52798, 58533, 58630, 65423, 65456, 66085
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A542616Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:ParraguirreCase Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:None for Justice ParraguirrePanel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/21/2015How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/18/2014Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from Joel D. Odou.
07/18/2014Petition/WritFiled Petitioner, D.R. Horton, Inc.'s Peition for Writ Of Prohibition And/Or Mandamus.14-23319
07/18/2014OtherJustice Ron Parraguirre disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Voluntary Recusal.
07/18/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 1.14-23340
07/18/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 2.14-23341
07/18/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 3.14-23342
07/18/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 414-23343
07/18/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 5.14-23344
07/18/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 6.14-23345
07/18/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 7.14-23346
07/18/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 8.14-23347
09/26/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Real Party in Interest's Answer due: 30 days. Petitioner shall have 15 days from service of real party in interest's answer to file any reply.14-32032
10/16/2014MotionFiled Real Party in Interest High Noon at Arlington Ranch Homeowners Association's Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief.14-34508
11/04/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time. Real Party in Interest's Answer due: November 7, 2014.14-36436
11/07/2014Petition/WritFiled Real Party in Interest High Noon at Arlington Ranch Homeowners Association's Answering Brief.14-36932
11/13/2014MotionFiled Petitioner D.R. Horton, Inc.'s Motion To Extend Time To File Reply Brief.14-37371
12/05/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time. Petitioner's reply due: December 8, 2014.14-39619
12/08/2014Petition/WritFiled Petitioner, D.R. Horton, Inc.'s Reply In Support Of Its Petition For Writ Of Petition And/Or Mandamus.14-39834
03/04/2015Order/IncomingFiled District court order. Copy of order filed in district court on 2/27/14.15-06760
05/21/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision without Oral Argument.15-15700
10/29/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petitions denied." Fn1[The Honorable Ron D. Parraguirre, Justice, voluntarily recused himself of participation of these petitions.] Before the Court En Banc. Author: Hardesty, C.J. Majority: Hardesty/Douglas/Cherry/Saitta/Gibbons/Pickering. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 86. EN BANC Nos. 66085/6610115-33024
11/23/2015RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.15-35764
11/23/2015Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.