Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 66117
Short Caption:STATE VS. SMITH (TERRANCE)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR110613Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/21/2014Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
07/21/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Filed certified copy of notice of appeal. (Fast Track Notice issued to counsel for appellant.)14-23584
07/21/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Request Rough Draft Transcripts. Due date: 10 days.14-23590
07/25/2014Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request.14-24295
09/03/2014Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant shall have until September 9, 2014, to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix.14-29048
09/05/2014Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement.14-29517
09/05/2014AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Vol. I.14-29518
09/05/2014AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Vol. II.14-29519
09/05/2014AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Vol. III.14-29520
09/15/2014MotionFiled Motion for Leave to File Oversized Fast Track Response.14-30506
10/02/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the fast track response received via E-Flex on September 15, 2014. Appellant: 14 days to file any fast track reply.14-32777
10/02/2014Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response.14-32778
10/17/2014Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's reply to fast track response due: October 23, 2014.14-34563
10/23/2014Fast Track BriefFiled Reply to Fast Track Response.14-35448
10/23/2014Case Status UpdateFast Track Briefing Completed.
04/15/2015Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP15-NS/MG/KP15-11353
04/17/2015MotionFiled Motion for Order Publishing Order of Affirmance.15-11706
09/03/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Affirmed." Fn1[We originally affirmed the judgment of the district court in an unpublished order filed on April 15, 2015. Smith subsequently moved for publication. we grant the motion and issue this opinion in place of our prior unpublished order.] Before: Saitta/Gibbons/Pickering. Majority: Saitta/Gibbons/Pickering. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 63. NN15-NS/MG/KP15-26717
09/28/2015RemittiturIssued Remittitur.15-29318
09/28/2015Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/07/2015RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on September 30, 2015.15-29318