The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 66118
Short Caption:BLANKENSHIP (LERON) VS. STATE C/W 66944Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Consolidated:66118*, 66944
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR140461Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: En Banc
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:05/04/2015 at 10:00 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:05/04/2015How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/21/2014Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
07/21/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Filed certified copy of notice of appeal. (Fast Track Notice issued to counsel for appellant.)14-23591
08/29/2014Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: September 9, 2014.14-28672
09/04/2014MotionFiled Motion for Court Order Directing Clerk of the District Court to Transmit Certain Confidential Documents Contained in CR14-0461 to this Court.14-29264
09/04/2014Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement.14-29268
09/04/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix.14-29269
09/19/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to have the presentence investigation report forwarded to this court. Due from the district court clerk: 20 days.14-31203
09/24/2014Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response.14-31692
09/30/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Notice (No Fast Track Reply).14-32468
09/30/2014Case Status UpdateFast Track Briefing Completed.
10/01/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk. (Presentence Investigation Report -SEALED)
11/13/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Full Briefing. Opening Brief due: 30 days.14-37356
11/18/2014BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.14-37983
12/18/2014BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.14-41249
12/30/2014BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.14-42462
12/30/2014Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
03/27/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.15-09382
03/30/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Monday, May 4, 2015, at 10:00 a.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City.15-09565
04/20/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.15-11771
05/04/2015Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
07/21/2016Opinion/DispositionalFiled Filed Authored Opinion. "Conviction affirmed, sentence vacated, and remanded with instructions (Docket No. 66118); conviction affirmed (Docket No. 66944)." Fn1[We consolidate these appeals for disposition.] Before the Court En Banc. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Parraguirre/Douglas/Cherry/Saitta/Gibbons/Pickering. 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 50. EN BANC Nos. 66118/6694416-22644
08/15/2016RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Nos. 66118/66944.16-25191
08/15/2016Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. Nos. 66118/66944.
08/26/2016RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 16, 2016.16-25191