Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 66144
Short Caption:MAKI (CHARLES) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):30904, 63845, 67717, 67800, 69049, 78260
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR940345Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Chief Justice Gibbons for Justice ParraguirrePanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/22/2014How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/24/2014Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
07/24/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.14-24214
08/13/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record. Record due from district court clerk: 60 days.14-26570
09/22/2014Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal, Vol 1.14-31462
09/22/2014Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal, Vol. 2.14-31463
09/22/2014Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal, Vol. 3.14-31464
09/22/2014Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal, Vol. 4.14-31466
09/22/2014Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal, Vol. 5.14-31467
09/22/2014Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal, Vol. 6.14-31468
09/22/2014Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
09/25/2014Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (SEALED Volume 7)
12/11/2014Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn3[We have reviewed all documents that appellant has submitted in proper person to the clerk of this court in this matter, and we conclude that no relief based upon those submissions is warranted.] NNP14-MG/KP/NS14-40402
01/06/2015RemittiturIssued Remittitur.15-00402
01/06/2015Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/16/2015RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on January 12, 2015.15-00402