The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 66157
Short Caption:HARRISON VS. HARRISON (CHILD CUSTODY)Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Fast Track Child Custody
Related Case(s):66072, 70727
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D443611Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: En Banc
Replacement:Expedited
To SP/Judge:07/29/2014 / Levitt, LansfordSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:12/08/2015 at 1:30 PMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:12/08/2015How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/29/2014Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Kainen Law Group. Check no. 2611.
07/29/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SEALED).
07/29/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.14-24639
07/29/2014Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt.14-24739
08/11/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Association of Counsel, Kirk Ross Harrison on his own behalf.14-26296
08/19/2014MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time for Docketing Statement.14-27300
08/19/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge and all Parties. (Notice issued in error-All parties have been served)14-27339
08/21/2014Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals (Appellant/Cross-Respondent).14-27648
08/21/2014Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Cross-Appeal.
08/21/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Respondent/Cross-Appellant Vivian Harrison). (SEALED)
08/21/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (Cross-Appeal.)14-27657
08/22/2014Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Radford Smith. E-Payment - Conf. no. 14082237206514.
08/25/2014Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for October 14, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. Nos. 66072/66157.14-28035
09/02/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance, Gary R. Silverman, of the firm of Silverman, Decaria & Kattelman, CHTD., for the Respondent/Cross-Appellant Vivian Marie Lee Harrison.14-28894
09/02/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance, Mary Anne Decaria, of the firm of Silverman, Decaria & Kattelman, CHTD., for the Respondent/Cross-Appellant Vivian Marie Lee Harrison.14-28895
09/10/2014Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.14-30016
09/10/2014Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Exhibits.14-30031
09/10/2014Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Exhibits.14-30037
09/11/2014MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Cross-Appeal.14-30149
09/12/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss Cross-Appeal.14-30342
10/10/2014Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 1/27/15 at 9:30 a.m.14-33747
10/24/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. (Appellant/Cross-Respondent). (SEALED)
10/24/2014Filing FeeReturned Filing Fee. Check No. 2811 returned to Kainen Law Group.
01/13/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. In light of appellant/cross-respondent's "Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss Cross-Appeal," no action will be taken in response to the motion to dismiss. Further, as appellant/cross-respondent's docketing statement was filed despite its untimeliness, the motion for an extension of time to file that docketing statement is denied as moot.15-01405
02/02/2015Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.15-03557
02/06/2015Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated Pursuant to NRAP3E. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant/cross-repsondent (appellant) and Respondent/cross-apellant (respondent): 10 days transcript request; Appellant: 40 days fast track statement and appendix.15-04042
02/09/2015Transcript RequestFiled Appellant/Cross-Respondent Certificate Pursuant to NRAP 9(a)(1)(C) (Certificate of No Transcript Request).15-04221
02/18/2015Transcript RequestFiled Respondent/Cross-Appellant Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 01/28/13, 10/30/13, 12/18/13, 01/22/14, 05/21/14. To Court Reporter: Department Q.15-05175
02/27/2015MotionFiled Motion to Remove Appeal from Fast Track Program and Motion to Suspend Time for Fast Track Statement.15-06287
03/11/2015MotionFiled Opposition to Motion To Remove Appeal From Fast Track Program; Opposition to Motion to Suspend Time for Fast Track Statement.15-07494
03/17/2015MotionFiled Reply in Support of Motion to Remove Appeal from Fast Track Program and to Suspend time for Fast Track Statement.15-08161
03/20/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant/cross-respondent: Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: 15 days. Respondent/cross-appellant shall have 20 days from service of appellant/cross-respondent's fast track statement to file and sere a combined fast track response on appeal and fast track statement on cross-appeal. Appellant/cross-respondent shall have 20 days from service of respondent/cross-appellant's combined statement to file and serve the fast track response on cross-appeal.15-08590
03/24/2015MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time for Fast Track Statement.15-08980
03/24/2015MotionFiled Motion to Expand Fast Track Statement.15-08983
03/26/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motions. We grant appellant/cross-respondent's motion for extension of time to file fast track statement. We also grant appellant/cross-respondent's motion for leave to file a fast track statement in excess of the type-volume limitation. Appellant/cross-respondent shall have until April 13, 2015 to file and serve an appendix and a fast track statement containing no more than 10,000 words.15-09271
04/08/2015Fast Track BriefFiled Child Custody Fast Track Statement.15-10625
04/08/2015AppendixFiled Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Appendix to Fast Track Statement Volumes 1-8.15-10635
04/29/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Combined fast track response on appeal and fast track statement on cross-appeal due: May 5, 2015.15-13057
05/06/2015Fast Track BriefFiled Respondent/Cross-Appellant Child Custody Fast Track Response.15-13805
05/06/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Child Custody Fast Track Response.15-13809
05/13/2015MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Reply to Fast Track Response, and to File Supplemental Appendix.15-14733
05/14/2015MotionFiled Respondent's Opposition to Appellant's Motion for Permission to File Reply to Fast Track Response, and to File Supplemental Appendix.15-14843
05/15/2015MotionFiled Reply in Support of Motion for Permission to File Reply to Fast Track Response.15-14992
05/20/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Respondent/cross-appellant shall have 11 days from the date of this order to file and serve either (1) a combined fast track response on appeal and fast track statement on cross-appeal or (2) a motion to voluntarily dismiss the cross-appeal. Given this directive, appellant/cross-respondent's motion to file a reply to the fast track response and a supplemental appendix is denied without prejudice. The clerk shall reject the reply to fast track response and supplemental appendix received on May 15, 2015.15-15510
05/29/2015MotionFiled Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss Cross-Appeal.15-16479
06/01/2015MotionFiled Renewed Motion for Permission to File Reply to Fast Track Response, and to File Supplemental Appendix.15-16647
06/02/2015MotionFiled Respondent's Renewed Opposition to Appellant's Motion for Permission to File Reply to Fast Track Response, and To File Supplemental Appendix.15-16725
06/03/2015MotionFiled Renewed Reply in Support of Motion for Permission to File Reply to Fast Track Response and Supp. App.15-16932
06/17/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Dismissing Cross-Appeal. Respondent/Cross-Appellant's motion for a voluntary dismissal of the cross-appeal is granted. The cross-appeal is dismissed.15-18435
06/22/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the reply to fast track response and supplemental appendix received on June 1, 2015.15-18955
06/22/2015Fast Track BriefFiled Reply to Fast Track Response.15-18958
06/22/2015AppendixFiled Supplemental Appendix - Volume 9.15-18959
06/22/2015Case Status UpdateFast Track Briefing Completed.
10/14/2015TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Lawanda Brown stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 09/22/15.15-31223
11/12/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Tuesday, December 8, 2015, at 1:30 p.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas.15-34501
11/23/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.15-35727
12/08/2015Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
02/25/2016TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Lawanda Brown stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 01/26/16.16-06039
03/03/2016TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Kim Gurule stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 07/18/12.16-06927
07/28/2016Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Douglas. J. Majority: Douglas/Parraguirre/Saitta/Pickering. Hardesty, J., with whom Cherry and Gibbons, JJ., agree, dissenting. 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 56. EN BANC16-23434
08/22/2016RemittiturIssued Remittitur.16-26096
08/22/2016Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/15/2016RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 29, 2016.16-26096
11/07/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter to Publishers regarding Corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 67656/64349;64452;65497/64702;65007;65172/65562/66697/66157/67660/56329/69169 (Filed in docket no. 67656 document no. 16-34632)