Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 66177
Short Caption:S. HIGHLANDS CMTY. ASS'N. VS. SAN FLORENTINE AVE. TRUSTCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):73684
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A685780Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:06/30/2015 at 10:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:06/30/2015How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/30/2014Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court.
07/30/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)14-24913
07/30/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.14-24916
07/31/2014Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Law Offices Alverson, Taylor, Mortensen & Sanders. Check No. 106719.
08/04/2014Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant(s) 15 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief:14-25510
08/19/2014Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.14-27220
08/19/2014Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 6/1/2014. To Court Reporter: Maureen Schorn.14-27336
09/02/2014TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Renee Silvaggio stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 6/17/14.14-28774
11/14/2014BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.14-37689
11/14/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Joint Appendix.14-37690
12/16/2014BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.14-40910
01/15/2015BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.15-01721
01/15/2015Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
05/28/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order re: Scheduling Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.15-16224
06/01/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Tuesday, June 30, 2015, at 10:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City.15-16569
06/15/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.15-18160
06/30/2015Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
01/14/2016Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Parraguirre, C.J. Majority: Parraguirre/Hardesty/Douglas/Cherry/Saitta/Gibbons/Pickering. 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 3. EN BANC16-01247
02/08/2016RemittiturIssued Remittitur.16-04059
02/08/2016Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/19/2016RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on February 11, 2016.16-04059
03/28/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter to the publishers regarding corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 59837/66177/66851/63180 (Letter entered in no. 59837 as document no. 16-09657.)