Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Administrative Case: ADKT 0499
Short Caption:IN RE: AMENDMENTS TO SUPREME COURT RULE 207 (BOARD OF CLE)Court:Supreme Court
Classification:Administrative - ADKT - ADKTCase Status:ADKT Order Filed
Filed Date:07/30/2014Public Hearing:01/08/2015 at 1:00 PM (Nevada Supreme Court Courtroom, Carson City, NV)
12/08/2015 at 3:00 PM (Nevada Supreme Court Courtroom, Las Vegas)
09/20/2018 at 2:00 PM (Nevada Supreme Court Courtroom, Carson City VACATED)
11/05/2018 at 3:00 PM (Nevada Supreme Court Courtroom, Carson City)
Closed Date:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/30/2014Administrative CaseFiled Petition.14-24920
12/24/2014Administrative CaseFiled Order Scheduling Public Hearing and Requesting Public Comment. A copy of the petition and the proposed amendments are attached. Hearing to be held Thursday, January 8, 2015, at 1 p.m. in the Supreme Court Courtroom in Carson City. Videoconferenced to RJC in Las Vegas. Original and 8 copies of written comments due to Clerk by 5 p.m. on January 2, 2015. Persons interested in participating must notify the Clerk no later than January 2, 2015.14-42114
01/08/2015Administrative CasePublic Hearing Held. Public Hearing held on the Administrative Docket.
02/06/2015Administrative CaseFiled Order. This court has concluded that a study committee should be appointed to consider amendments to Supreme Court Rule 207. Chief Justice shall appoint and chair as study committee of not less than six members, with at least two members from the Board of Continuing Legal Education and at least two members from the State Bar Board of Governors.15-03967
04/28/2015Administrative CaseFiled Order Extending Time for Report from Study Committee. On February 6, 2015, this court entered an order concluding that a study committee should be appointed. On March 2, 2015, the following individuals were appointed to the committee: Thomas Beko; Eric Dobberstein; Jenny Hubach; Katie Howell McConnell; Leon Mead; Kathleen Paustian; and Richard Pocker. The committee shall have until July 31, 2015, in which to file its recommendations with this court.15-12853
07/31/2015Administrative CaseFiled Order Extending Time for Report from Study Committee. The committee shall have until August 31, 2015, to file its recommendations with this court.15-23223
08/28/2015Administrative CaseFiled Order Extending Time for Report From Study Committee. On February 6, 2015, this court entered an order concluding that a study committee should be appointed in this matter and directing the study committee to make recommendations to this court as deemed appropriate. The report was due to be filed by July 31, 2015, however, this court previously extended the deadline because the committee was awaiting the completion of a new business plan by the CLE Board before submitting its recommendations. The business plan was provided to the committee on August 18, 2015, and the deadline for filing the report is hereby extended to September 15, 2015.15-26223
09/15/2015Administrative CaseFiled Report of the Study Committee.15-27965
10/02/2015Administrative CaseFiled Order Scheduling Public Hearing and Requesting Public Comment. Hearing to be held Monday, November 2, 2015, at 3:30 p.m. in the Supreme Court Courtroom in Carson City. Video-conferenced to RJC in Las Vegas. Original and 8 copies of written comments due to Clerk by 5 p.m. on October 28, 2015. Persons interested in participating must notify the Clerk no later than October 28, 2015.15-30019
10/26/2015Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Rene Valladares with the Federal Public Defender.15-32645
10/28/2015Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Barry Goold with Goold Patterson.15-32872
10/28/2015Administrative CaseFiled Order Rescheduling Public Hearing. The hearing that was previously scheduled for November 2, 2015, is hereby rescheduled to December 8, 2015, at 3:00 p.m. in the Nevada Supreme Court Courtroom in Las Vegas. Video-conferenced to Nevada Supreme Court Courtroom, Carson City. Further, the deadline for submitting comments is extended. Original and 8 copies of written comments due to Clerk by 5 p.m. on December 4, 2015. Persons interested in participating must notify the Clerk no later than December 4, 2015.15-32876
10/28/2015Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Kimberly Farmer, Executive Director for the State Bar of Nevada.15-32948
10/28/2015Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Damon K Dias with Dias Law Group on behalf of Clark County Bar Association.15-32949
11/06/2015Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Barbara Buckley with the Legal Aid Center of Southern Nevada.15-33982
11/19/2015Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Robin Sweet with the Administrative Office of the Courts.15-35382
12/07/2015Administrative CaseFiled Comments from State of Nevada Board of Continuing Legal Education (Business Plan).15-37131
12/08/2015Administrative CasePublic Hearing Held. Public Hearing held on the Administrative Docket.
01/27/2016Administrative CaseFiled State Bar of Nevada Response to the NVCLE Business Plan and Additional Information as Requested by the Court.16-02879
01/28/2016Administrative CaseFiled Response from the State of Nevada CLE Board to the State Bar of Nevada's follow up response to the proposed NVCLE Board's Business Plan.16-03005
02/01/2016Administrative CaseFiled Response from Clark County Bar Association.16-03317
02/17/2016Administrative CaseFiled Response to Public Hearing held on December 8, 2015 from Lance Hendron with Nevada Attorneys for Criminal Justice.16-05024
04/12/2016Administrative CaseFiled Letter from Jenny Hubach with the State of Nevada Board of Continuing Legal Education regarding a follow up to the Board's letter to the Court on January 26, 2016.16-11309
07/12/2016Administrative CaseFiled Follow-up Letter from Catherine M Mazzeo with Clark County Bar Association regarding proposed amendments.16-21704
09/20/2016Administrative CaseFiled Letter from Jenny Hubach with the CLE Board regarding follow up to joint meeting conducted by Justice Hardesty.16-29122
11/15/2016Administrative CaseFiled Order. Amendments to Supreme Court Rules effective January 1, 2017. Exhibits A, B, C, and D attached.16-35595
11/28/2016Administrative CaseFiled Letter from Kimberly Farmer with the State Bar of Nevada regarding Amendments to Nevada Supreme Court Rules.16-36771
05/22/2017Administrative CaseFiled Report/Incoming from Board of Continuing Legal Education. Annual report.17-17030
10/11/2017Administrative CaseFiled Order Modifying Rule Amendment. We direct the clerk of this court to modify Exhibit D to the order filed on November 15, 2016, by deleting "submit an annual compliance report." and adding "check his or her online transcript for accuracy." after "hours, and".17-34512
06/14/2018Administrative CaseFiled Report/Incoming from Board of Continuing Legal Education. Annual report.18-22711
07/03/2018Administrative CaseFiled Request for Amendment to ADKT 0499.18-25171
07/23/2018Administrative CaseFiled Order Scheduling Public Hearing and Requesting Public Comment. Proposed amendments are attached. Hearing to be held Wednesday, September 5, 2018, at 2:00 p.m. in the Supreme Court Courtroom in Carson City. Videoconferenced to Las Vegas Courtroom. Comments due to Clerk by 5:00 p.m. on August 29, 2018. Persons interested in participating must notify the Clerk no later than August 29, 2018.18-28109
07/24/2018Administrative CaseFiled Amended Order Scheduling Public Hearing and Requesting Public Comment. Proposed amendments are attached (Exhibit A and B). Hearing to be held Wednesday, September 5, 2018, at 2:00 p.m. in the Supreme Court Courtroom in Carson City. Videoconferenced to Las Vegas Courtroom. Comments due to Clerk by 5:00 p.m. on August 29, 2018. Persons interested in participating must notify the Clerk no later than August 29, 2018.18-28285
07/25/2018Administrative CaseFiled Order Regarding Public Hearing. The public hearing is hereby rescheduled for September 20, 2018, at 2:00 p.m. in Carson City. Video-conferenced to Las Vegas. Comments due by September 7, 2018, at 5:00 p.m.18-28444
08/29/2018Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Marshal S Willick with Willick Law Group.18-33848
08/31/2018Administrative CaseFiled Request to Withdraw Request for Amendment to ADKT 0499.18-34206
09/04/2018Administrative CaseFiled Order. The Honorable Lynne K. Simons, District Judge, has filed a request to withdraw the petition filed on July 3, 2018, seeking to amend Nevada Supreme Court Rules 207 through 215. The request to withdraw the petition is granted. The public hearing in this matter scheduled for September 20, 2018, at 2:00 p.m. in Carson City is vacated.18-34264
09/07/2018Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Clark County Bar Association.18-35057
10/01/2018Administrative CaseFiled Renewed Request for Amendment to ADKT 0499.18-38288
10/03/2018Administrative CaseFiled Order Scheduling Public Hearing and Requesting Public Comment. Proposed amendments are attached. Hearing to be held Monday, November 5, 2018, at 3:00 p.m. in the Supreme Court Courtroom in Carson City. Videoconferenced to Las Vegas Courtroom. Comments due to Clerk by 5:00 p.m. on October 24, 2018. Persons interested in participating must notify the Clerk no later than October 24, 2018.18-38648
10/22/2018Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Richard Pocker with the State Bar of Nevada.18-41343
10/23/2018Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Constance Akridge with Nevada Bar Foundation. (via-email)18-41597
10/24/2018Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Nell Christensen with the Clark County District Attorney's Office.18-41813
10/24/2018Administrative CaseFiled Comments from JoNell Thomas and Jordan Savage with Office of the Special Public Defender. (via-fax)18-41822
10/24/2018Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Rene L Valladares and Lori Teicher with Federal Public Defender.18-41872
10/24/2018Administrative CaseFiled Comments from John J Piro with Nevada Attorney for Criminal Justice.18-41878
10/24/2018Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Richard Pocker with the State Bar of Nevada. (via original)18-41880
10/24/2018Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Stacy Rocheleau with Southern Nevada Association of Women Attorneys.18-41884
10/24/2018Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Pat Leverty with Nevada Justice Association.18-41903
10/24/2018Administrative CaseFiled Comments from John P Aldrich with Clark County Bar Association.18-41957
10/25/2018Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Peter J Goatz with Legal Aid Center.18-42031
10/25/2018Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Constance Akridge with Nevada Bar Foundation. (via-original)18-42165
11/01/2018Administrative CaseFiled Comments from JoNell Thomas and Jordan Savage with Office of the Special Public Defender. (via-original)18-42993
11/01/2018Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Julia M Murray with Office of the Public Defender.18-42994
11/01/2018Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Jenny Dianne Hubach with State of Nevada Board of Continuing Legal Education. (Supplement to Request for Amendment and Response to Public Comment)18-43025
11/02/2018Administrative CaseFiled Comments from John Arrascada with Washoe County Public Defender. (Response and Comments to Renewed Request for Amendment)18-43124
11/05/2018Administrative CasePublic Hearing Held. Public Hearing held on the Administrative Docket.
11/06/2018Administrative CaseFiled Order Inviting Additional Comments. Comments may be submitted electronically or in hard-copy. All comments must be submitted by 5:00 p.m., November 13, 2018.18-903123
11/08/2018Administrative CaseFiled Comments/Incoming from The Honorable Gloria J. Sturman, President of Howard D. McKibben Chapter of the American Inn of Court.18-903526
11/09/2018Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Christopher Lalli with Clark County District Attorneys Office.18-903657
11/13/2018Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Marshal Willick with The Willick Law Group.18-903982
12/21/2018Administrative CaseFiled Order Amending Supreme Court Rules 207, 208, 210. 212, 213, and 215. Exhibit A attached. Effective February 1, 2019.18-909902
01/16/2019Administrative CaseFiled Report to Court on Proposed Efficiencies in CLE Board Operations.19-02462