Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 66231
Short Caption:IN RE: CONNELL LIVING TRUST C/W 67782/68046Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:66231*, 67782, 68046Related Case(s):67782, 68046, 69737, 71577, 72766, 72897, 73837, 74517, 75107, 75593
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - P066425Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/14/2014 / Saint-Aubin, RobertSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/02/2016How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/06/2014Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal.
08/06/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.14-25706
08/06/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.14-25709
08/08/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk - Confidential Civil Cover Sheet.
08/12/2014Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Jeffrey Burr Ltd. - check no. 42847.
08/12/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days.14-26350
08/14/2014Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Robert F. Saint-Aubin.14-26772
08/29/2014Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.14-28620
09/05/2014Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 9:00 am on October 15, 2014.14-29512
10/29/2014Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/Settlement. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter.14-35935
11/03/2014Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order re: Stipulation/Motion to Dismiss. Stipulation or Motion to Dismiss Due: 21 days.14-36230
11/04/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorney (David L. Mann, Esq. as counsel for Appellant, Eleanor Connell Hartman Ahern in place and stead of John R. Mugan, Esq., Michael D. Lum, Esq., and Jeffrey Burr, Esq.).14-36464
11/05/2014Settlement Program ReportFiled Revised Interim Settlement Program Report. The final Settlement Report is amended or withdrawn. After filing of that report appellant replaced counsel. New counsel asserts that no global settlement was reached, a view disputed by respondent counsel. Discussions reopened to see if the new issues can be resolved.14-36581
11/07/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Notice Appellant's Response to Settlement Judge's Report.14-36804
11/24/2014MotionFiled Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Eleanor Ahern.14-38593
11/26/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys, Dale A. Hayes, Esq., Liane K. Wakayama, Esq., and Candice E. Renka, Esq., of the law firm of Marquis Aurbach Coffing, for Eleanor Ahern.14-38987
12/22/2014Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.14-41782
02/27/2015Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. Fn1[In light of the substitution of attorneys filed on November 26, 2014, the Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Eleanor Ahern filed by David L. Mann, is denied as moot.]15-06252
03/13/2015Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request.15-07835
04/23/2015MotionFiled Marquis Aurbach Coffing's NRAP 27(e) Emergency Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Eleanor Connell Hartman Ahern.15-12319
04/24/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Withdraw. The clerk of this court shall remove Dale A. Hayes, Liane K. Wakayama, Candice E. Renka, and the law firm of Marquis Aurbach Coffing from the docket of this appeal. Appellant: Notice of Appearance due: 30 days. Briefing suspended.15-12585
05/26/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance as Counsel on Appeal (Kirk B. Lenhard, Tamara Beatty Peterson and Benjamin K. Reitz of Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP as counsel for the Appellant).15-15929
06/01/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance of Counsel on Appeal, Whitney B. Warnick, Esq. of Albright, Stodard, Warnick & Albright for the Respondent.15-16543
06/03/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Reinstating Briefing. Transcript Request Form due: 15 days. Opening Brief and Appendix due: 90 days.15-16910
06/18/2015Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 01/14/15, 04/22/15, 05/13/15 (Esparza), 12/19/14, 02/18/15 (Haak). To Court Reporter: Kerry Esparza and Francesca Haak.15-18723
07/14/2015TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter Kerry Esparza stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 01/14/15.15-21310
08/07/2015MotionFiled Motion to Consolidate Related Appeals.15-23844
08/26/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Request for Notices.15-25904
08/26/2015MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time (Opening Brief and Appendix).15-25926
08/26/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief and Appendix due: October 1, 2015.15-25934
08/31/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. We hereby consolidate these appeals. Appellant shall file a single opening brief and appendix on or before October 21, 2015. The clerk of this court shall add attorney Michael K. Wall for notice only on the docket of these consolidated appeals. Nos. 66231/67782/68046.15-26344
10/19/2015MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time. (Opening Brief) Nos.66231/67782/68046.15-31705
10/23/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: November 20, 2015. Nos. 66231/67782/68046.15-32420
11/20/2015BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. Nos. 66231/67782/68046.15-35643
11/20/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 1 of 17. Nos. 66231/67782/68046.15-35644
11/20/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 2 of 17. Nos. 66231/67782/68046.15-35645
11/20/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 3 of 17. Nos. 66231/67782/68046.15-35646
11/20/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 4 of 17. Nos. 66231/67782/68046.15-35647
11/20/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 5 of 17. Nos. 66231/67782/68046.15-35650
11/20/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 6 of 17. Nos. 66231/67782/68046.15-35651
11/20/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 7 of 17. Nos. 66231/67782/68046.15-35652
11/20/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 8 of 17. Nos. 66231/67782/68046.15-35653
11/20/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 9 of 17. Nos. 66231/67782/68046.15-35654
11/20/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 10 of 17. Nos. 66231/67782/68046.15-35655
11/20/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 11 of 17. Nos. 66231/67782/68046.15-35656
11/20/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 12 of 17. Nos. 66231/67782/68046.15-35657
11/20/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 13 of 17. Nos. 66231/67782/68046.15-35658
11/20/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 14 of 17. Nos. 66231/67782/68046.15-35659
11/20/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 15 of 17. Nos. 66231/67782/68046.15-35660
11/20/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 16 of 17. Nos. 66231/67782/68046.15-35661
11/20/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 17 of 17. Nos. 66231/67782/68046.15-35662
11/25/2015MotionFiled Motion to File Portions of Appendix Under Seal. Nos. 66231/67782/68046.15-36164
12/04/2015MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief.15-37023
12/21/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion and Approving Stipulation. The clerk of this court shall file the portions of the appendix received on November 25, 2015, under seal. Answering Brief due: January 20, 2016. Nos. 66231/67782/68046.15-39035
12/21/2015AppendixFiled Portions of Appellant's Appendix Volume 13 (SEALED). Nos. 66231/67782/68046. (FILED UNDER SEAL PER ORDER 12/21/15).
12/21/2015AppendixFiled Portions of Appellant's Appendix Volume 14 (SEALED). Nos. 66231/67782/68046. (FILED UNDER SEAL PER ORDER 12/21/15).
12/21/2015AppendixFiled Portions of Appellant's Appendix Volume 15 (SEALED). Nos. 66231/67782/68046. (FILED UNDER SEAL PER ORDER 12/21/15).
01/07/2016MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time (Answering Brief). Nos. 66231/67782/68046.16-00545
01/12/2016TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Kerry Esparza stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 01/14/15, 10/14/15. Nos. 66231/67782/68046.16-00924
01/27/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: February 19, 2016. Nos. 66231/67782/68046.16-02798
02/19/2016BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. Nos. 66231/67782/68046.16-05446
02/19/2016AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix. Nos. 66231/67782/68046.16-05447
03/17/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Frederick Brown, a nonparty to these consolidated appeals, has submitted a request that this court take judicial notice of certain documents. Mr. Brown has neither sought nor been granted leave to file documents as an amicus curiae. Accordingly, we direct the clerk of this court to return, unfiled, the document received on February 18, 2016. Nos. 66231/67782/68046.16-08467
03/21/2016MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief. Nos. 66231/67782/68046.16-08878
03/29/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Approving Stipulation. Reply Brief due: April 4, 2016. Nos. 66231/67782/68046.16-09772
04/05/2016BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.16-10610
04/05/2016Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
05/02/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Nos. 66231/67782/68046.16-13593
08/10/2016MotionFiled Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Nos. 66231/67782/68046.16-24756
08/24/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Counsel for appellant, Tamara Beatty Peterson, has filed a motion to withdraw as counsel of record. Cause appearing, the motion is granted. The clerk of this court shall remove Tamara Beatty Peterson as counsel of record for appellant. Appellant shall continue to be represented by Kirk B. Lenhard and Benjamin K. Reitz of Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP. Nos. 66231/67782/68046.16-26343
01/26/2017Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal (Docket No. 66231) And Order of Affirmance (Docket Nos. 67782 and 68046). "ORDER the judgments of the district court in Docket Nos. 67782 and 68046 AFFIRMED and the appeal in Docket No. 66231 DISMISSED." Nos. 66231/67782/68046. SNP17-MD/MG/KP.17-02927
02/13/2017MotionFiled Respondent Jacqueline M. Montoyas' Motion to Reissue Order as Published Opinion Pursuant to NRAP 36(F). Nos. 66231/67782/68046.17-04902
05/04/2017Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Affirmed in part and dismissed in part." Fn1[We grant respondent Montoya's motion to reissue the order as an opinion, and issue this opinion in place of our prior order.] Before: Douglas/Gibbons/Pickering. Majority: Douglas/Gibbons/Pickering. 133 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 19. SNP17-MD/MG/KP Nos. 66231/67782/6804617-14811
06/01/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Filing Fee on Rehearing. Due date: 10 days.17-18276
09/29/2017OtherReturned Unfiled Document "Petition for Rehearing." Nos. 66231/67782/68046.17-33264
10/24/2017RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Nos. 68046/66231/6778217-36559
10/24/2017Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. Nos. 68046/66231/67782
11/13/2017RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 31, 2017.17-36559