Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 66257
Short Caption:BROMLEY VS. CASHMAN EQUIP. CO. C/W 66596Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:65596*, 66257Related Case(s):65596, 66876
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A647859Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/11/2014 / Turner, WilliamSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/08/2014Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court.
08/08/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)14-26122
08/08/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.14-26136
08/11/2014Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William C. Turner.14-26195
08/15/2014MotionFiled Motion to Consolidate Related Appeals. Nos. 65596/66257.14-26870
08/28/2014Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.14-28462
09/02/2014Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/Settlement. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. Nos. 65596/66257.14-28849
09/18/2014Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from McCormick Barstow LLP. Check No. 6240.
01/05/2015Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We grant Phillip Matthew Bromley's motion to consolidate these appeals for all appellate purposes. Pursuant to NRAP 16, the settlement judge has filed a report with this court indicating that the parties have agreed to a settlement. Accordingly, the parties shall have ten days from the date of this order to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss these consolidated appeals or otherwise inform this court of the status of this matter. Fn1 [We note that there is also a related original writ proceeding pending before this court, Breeden v. Dist. Ct., Docket No. 66876. It does not appear that dismissal of these consolidated appeals will have any effect on that matter.] Nos. 65596/66257.15-00183
01/08/2015MotionFiled Stipulation to Dismiss Appeals. Nos. 65596/66257.15-00874
01/12/2015Settlement Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal/Stipulation/Settlement. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, "this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). Case Closed/No Remittitur Issued. Nos. 65596/66257.15-01216