Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 66346
Short Caption:TAM, M.D. VS. DIST. CT. (CORNELL)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):66065, 72709
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A642525Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:04/07/2015 at 1:50 PMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:04/07/2015How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/22/2014Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from S. Brent Vogel.
08/22/2014Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus Regarding NRS 41A.035.14-27846
08/25/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 1.14-27878
08/25/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 2.14-27894
08/25/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 3.14-27896
09/02/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer. Real parties in interest's answer to writ petition due: 30 days. Petitioner: 15 days to file any reply.14-28775
10/01/2014Petition/WritFiled Real Parties In Interest Answer to Petitioners' Writ of Mandamus (Real Parties in Interest Sherry Cornell and Estate of Charles Thomas Cornell, Jr.).14-32590
10/14/2014Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's reply due: October 23, 2014.14-34095
10/23/2014Petition/WritFiled Reply to Answer to Petition -Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus Regarding NRS 41A.035.14-35325
02/25/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.15-05982
02/25/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled for Tuesday, April 7, 2015, at 1:50 p.m. for 20 minutes in Las Vegas.15-06000
03/17/2015MotionFiled Unopposed Motion to Allow Out of State Counsel to Appear at Oral Argument Without Presence of Nevada Attorney of Record.15-08196
03/23/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The unopposed motion of real parties in interest to allow counsel admitted pro hac vice to appear at oral argument without the presence of Nevada counsel is granted. Nos. 66065/66346.15-08709
03/23/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.15-08732
04/07/2015Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
10/01/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition granted." We therefore grant Dr. Tam's petition and instruct the clerk of this court to issue a writ of mandamus instructing the district court to vacate its order and to conduct further proceedings consistent with this opinion. Before the Court En Banc. Author: Hardesty, C.J. Majority: Hardesty/Parraguirre/Douglas/Cherry/Saitta/Gibbons/Pickering. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 80. EN BANC15-29735
10/01/2015WritIssued Writ with letter. Original and one copy of writ and copy of Opinion mailed to S. Brent Vogel for service upon Judge Jerry A. Wiese.15-29790
10/09/2015WritFiled Returned Writ. Original Writ returned. Served on Judge Jerry A. Wiese on October 5, 2015.15-30788
10/26/2015RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.15-32623
10/26/2015Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/10/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter dated February 8, 2016, to publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 62059/(61103/61640)/62745/63737/64881/65273/64214/61131/(60673/61390)/62061/64130/64484/65064/65632/66346/59685/(61305/61871)/(61324/63258)/65335/54389/64569 (Letter entered in 62059 as document no. 16-04455.)