Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 37553
Short Caption:WHEATON (SHAUNTAY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):37531, 40150, 42638, 44093, 46213, 46887, 51332, 53085, 62069, 62372, 66079, 66080, 66428, 66428-COA, 66773, 66773-COA, 69542, 70017, 70017-COA, 76899, 82127, 82127-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C156542Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/12/2002How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/12/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
03/12/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant).01-04435
03/28/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.01-05410
03/28/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 11/03/99 (SN); 03/30/00, 05/26/00, 07/31/01, 11/03/00, 12/11/00, 12/15/00, 02/06/01 (YV). To Court Reporter: Sharleen Nicholson and Yvonne Valentin.01-05411
03/29/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 11/03/99 & 11/04/99. Court Reporter: Sharleen Nichsolson & Jeri Anderson.01-05513
04/02/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certificate of Mailing.01-05602
05/21/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 3/30/00; 7/31/00; 11/3/00; 12/11/00; 2/6/01. Court Reporter: Yvonne Valentin.01-08395
07/11/2001MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: August 9, 2001.01-11687
07/18/2001Order/Procedural Order. To date, Ms. Nicholson has filed all transcripts requested of her. However, to date, Ms. Valentin has not filed all transcripts requested of her. Ms. Valentin shall have 20 days from the date of this order to prepare and file the transcripts for proceedings conducted on May 26, 2000, and December 15, 2000. If more time is needed, Ms. Valentin shall, within the same time period, file a motion requesting an extension of time. If the requested transcripts cannot be produced, Ms. Valentin shall notify this court, in writing, of this fact.01-12188
08/07/2001BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: LV Drop Box 08/03/01.01-13290
08/07/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 and 2.01-13291
08/13/2001Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from court reporter Yvonne M. Valentin re: transcripts requested in this court's 7/18/01 order.01-13742
09/04/2001BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark.01-14833
10/03/2001BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: LV Drop Box 10/1/01.01-16616
02/12/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein.02-02774
02/12/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP02-CY/DA/ML
05/14/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP02-CY/DA/ML.02-08473
06/11/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur.02-08555
06/11/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/22/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 17, 2002.02-08555