Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 66398
Short Caption:SZYMBORSKI VS. SPRING MTN. TREATMENT CTR.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A700178Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Pro Bono Program
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Justice Parraguirre for Justice SaittaPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:04/13/2016 at 1:30 PMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:04/13/2016How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/02/2014Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. In Forma Pauperis.
09/02/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. Filed certified copy of proper person notice of appeal. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.)14-28758
09/16/2014Transcript RequestFiled Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form.14-30588
10/17/2014BriefFiled Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement.14-34641
10/23/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Service. Appellant's Certificate of Service for NOA and CPPAS due: 15 days.14-35327
11/04/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Certificate of Service - Notice of Appeal and Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement served on respondent.14-36457
12/08/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record on Appeal due: 15 days.14-39825
12/15/2014Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal.14-40722
12/15/2014Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
01/30/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Pro Bono Counsel. We direct the clerk of this court to transmit a copy of this order and the attached case summary to the Legal Aid Center of Southern Nevada for financial eligibility screening. Notice of Appearance or written statement from Legal Aid Center due: 60 days.15-03302
03/09/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance of Pro Bono Counsel (Eric Olsen as counsel for the Appellant Lee Szymborski).15-07192
03/12/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Compliance with NRAP 9 and Setting Briefing Schedule. This appeal no longer stands submitted for decision on the civil pro se appeal statement. Transcript Request Form due: 14 days. Appellant's Opening Brief (replacement or supplement) and Appendix (optional) due: 90 days. Although, this matter will be scheduled for oral argument upon completion of briefing, counsel may notify this court in writing if counsel believes that oral argument is undesirable or unnecessary.15-07631
03/24/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Statement of Legal Aid Representation (Pursuant to NRS 12.015)15-08947
03/24/2015Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 06/24/14, 09/12/14. To Court Reporter: Rachelle Hamilton.15-08964
04/20/2015TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Rachelle Hamilton stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 06/24/14.15-11875
06/05/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Firm Affiliation and Address, Eric R. Olsen, Esq. Of Garman Turner Gordon, LLP.15-17198
06/10/2015MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Opening Brief.15-17745
06/10/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief and Appendix due: July 10, 2015.15-17750
06/10/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys (Tyson J. Dobbs as counsel for Respondents')15-17757
06/30/2015MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Opening Brief.15-20019
07/17/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: August 10, 2015.15-21677
08/10/2015MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Opening Brief.15-24091
08/13/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to the Opening Brief.15-24461
08/13/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to the Opening Brief. (Continued)15-24462
08/24/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion and Rejecting Opening Brief. We are unable to file the submitted opening brief at this time because it does not comply with NRAP 32. We direct the clerk of this court to reject the opening brief received on August 13, 2015. Opening Brief that complies with NRAP 32 due: August 28, 2015.15-25547
08/26/2015BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.15-25906
09/18/2015MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief.15-28326
09/18/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice - Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due: October 26, 2015.15-28333
10/27/2015MotionFiled Respondent Spring Mountain Treatment Center and Darryl Dubroca's Motion for Leave to File Their Answering Brief Instanter (Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief).15-32814
11/04/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion and Rejecting Answering Brief. We grant respondent's motion for an extension of time to file the answering brief. We are unable to file the submitted answering brief at this time, however, because it does not comply with NRAP 32. We direct the clerk of this court to reject the answering brief received on October 27, 2015. Answering Brief due: November 12, 2015.15-33677
11/05/2015BriefFiled Respondents Spring Mountain Treatment Center and Darryl Dubroca's Answering Brief.15-33833
12/09/2015MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Reply Brief.15-37521
12/16/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Approving Stipulation. Reply Brief due: December 21, 2015.15-38496
12/22/2015BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.15-39179
01/25/2016Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
02/04/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order. This appeal may be assigned to the court of appeals for disposition. Each party shall have until February 19, 2016, to file a written statement of no more than 500 words explaining why this court should not assign this appeal to the court of appeals. No extensions of time will be granted.16-03797
02/19/2016MotionFiled Statement in Response to Order. (Appellant)16-05473
03/02/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Having considered appellant's statement, this court will retain this appeal for disposition.16-06748
03/11/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Wednesday, April 13, 2016, at 1:30 pm for 30 minutes in Las Vegas.16-07825
03/30/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.16-09907
04/13/2016Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP16-JH/NS/KP.
10/26/2017Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed in part, reversed in part, and remanded." Before: Pickering/Hardesty/Parraguirre. Author: Pickering, J. Majority: Pickering/Parraguirre. Hardesty, J., concurring in part and dissenting in part. 133 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 80. SNP16-KP/JH/RP17-36853
11/20/2017RemittiturIssued Remittitur.17-39944
11/20/2017Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/07/2017RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on November 27, 2017.17-39944