Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 66428
Short Caption:MITCHELL (DEANGELO) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):37531, 37553, 40150, 42638, 44093, 46213, 46887, 51332, 53085, 62069, 62372, 66079, 66080, 66428-COA, 66773, 66773-COA, 69542, 70017, 70017-COA, 76899, 82127, 82127-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C156542Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/20/2014How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/04/2014Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
09/04/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.14-29190
09/09/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Entry and Transmission of Written Order. District Court Order due: 60 days.14-29774
09/25/2014Order/IncomingFiled District court order. Certified Copy of Order Denying Defendant's Pro Per Motion to Appoint Counsel & Order Denying Defendant's Pro Per Motion to Correct an Illegal Sentence filed in district court on 9/22/14.14-31906
10/21/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 60 days.14-34959
11/18/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk. Pre-Sentence Investigation Report (SEALED).
11/18/2014Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal pages 854-864 (SEALED).
11/18/2014Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volumes 1-17. Via FTP.14-38060
11/20/2014Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
01/07/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Transferring Case to Court of Appeals. The clerk of this court is directed to assign this appeal to the Court of Appeals of Nevada for disposition.15-00590
02/05/2015Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/AS
05/11/2015Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals.
05/11/2015RemittiturIssued Remittitur.15-14318
05/11/2015Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/26/2015RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 15, 2015.15-14318