Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 66452
Short Caption:CASHMAN EQUIP. CO. VS. CAM CONSULTING, INC. C/W 61715/65819Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:61715*, 65819, 66452Related Case(s):61715, 65819, 76439
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A642583Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:10/24/2014 / Shirinian, AraSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/05/2016How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/08/2014Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal.
09/08/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.14-29605
09/08/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.14-29607
09/08/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days.14-29609
09/18/2014Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Pezzillo Lloyd. Check No. 9104
09/23/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days.14-31555
09/26/2014Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant(s) 15 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief:14-32095
09/30/2014MotionFiled Stipulation to Consolidate Case No. 66452 With Case No. 65819 and Case no. 61715.14-32379
10/01/2014MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time to File Case Appeal Statement. (DETACHED CASE APPEAL STATEMENT AND FILED PER ORDER OF 10/20/14).14-32704
10/20/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Consolidating Appeals and Referring Appeals to Settlement Program. The clerk of this court shall consolidate Docket No. 66452 with Docket Nos. 61715 and 65819. We refer these appeals to the settlement program. The deadlines for preparing transcripts and briefing remain stayed pending further order of this court. Fn2[Appellant's October 1, 2014, motion for an extension of time to file the case appeal statement in Docket No. 66452 is approved. The clerk of this court shall detach from the motion and file appellant's case appeal statement. The clerk of this court shall remove the following respondents from the caption of these appeals: CAM Consulting, Inc., Angelo Carvalho, and Janel Rennie a/k/a Janel Carvalho.]14-34913
10/20/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement (Docket No. 66452).14-34914
10/24/2014Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Settlement Judge Reassignment. Issued Amended Notice of Assignment to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. New Settlement Judge: Ara H. Shirinian.14-35601
11/10/2014Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 12/18/14 at 10:00. Nos. 61715/65819/66452.14-37042
01/27/2015Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Nos. 61715/65819/66452.15-02870
01/28/2015Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days transcript request; 90 days to fle a single opening brief and appendix. Appellant has failed to file the docketing statement in Docket No. 66452 when due. Docketing statement due: 10 days. Nos. 61715/65819/66452.15-03043
02/11/2015Transcript RequestFiled Certificate That No Transcript Is Being Requested. Nos. 61715/65819/66452.15-04521
02/12/2015Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement - Civil Appeals. Nos. 61715/65819/66452.15-04656
04/13/2015MotionFiled Stipulation To Extend Briefing Schedule (First Request). Nos. 61715/65819/6645215-10940
04/13/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice - Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief and Appendix due: May 28, 2015. Nos. 61715/65819/66452.15-10957
05/08/2015MotionFiled Stipulation To Dismiss Respondents Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland and Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America With Prejudice.15-14085
05/18/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Dismissing Appeals. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, these consolidated appeals are dismissed as to respondents Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland and Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America only. The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. Nos. 61715/65819/66452.15-15250
05/21/2015MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Briefing Schedule (Second Request). Nos. 61715/65819/66452.15-15670
05/29/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. We elect to treat the stipulation as a joint motion. for an extension of time, and we grant the motion. Opening Brief due: June 18, 2015. Nos. 61715/65819/66452.15-16449
06/17/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 1. Nos. 61715/65819/66452.15-18469
06/17/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 2. Nos. 61715/65819/66452.15-18471
06/17/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 3. Nos. 61715/65819/66452.15-18474
06/17/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 4. Nos. 61715/65819/66452.15-18503
06/17/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 5. Nos. 61715/65819/66452.15-18507
06/17/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 6. Nos. 61715/65819/66452.15-18515
06/17/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 7. Nos. 61715/65819/66452.15-18516
06/17/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 8. Nos. 61715/65819/66452.15-18520
06/17/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 9. Nos. 61715/65819/66452.15-18521
06/17/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 10. Nos. 61715/65819/66452.15-18523
06/17/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 11. Nos. 61715/65819/66452.15-18524
06/17/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 12. Nos. 61715/65819/66452.15-18530
06/17/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 13. Nos. 61715/65819/66452.15-18532
06/17/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 14. Nos. 61715/65819/66452.15-18533
06/17/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 15. Nos. 61715/65819/66452.15-18534
06/17/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 16. Nos. 61715/65819/66452.15-18535
06/17/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 17. Nos. 61715/65819/66452.15-18536
06/17/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 18. Nos. 61715/65819/66452.15-18537
06/17/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 19. Nos. 61715/65819/66452.15-18538
06/17/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 20. Nos. 61715/65819/66452.15-18539
06/17/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 21. Nos. 61715/65819/66452.15-18540
06/17/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 22. Nos. 61715/65819/66452.15-18541
06/17/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 23. Nos. 61715/65819/66452.15-18542
06/17/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 24. Nos. 61715/65819/66452.15-18543
06/17/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 25. Nos. 61715/65819/66452.15-18544
06/17/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 26. Nos. 61715/65819/66452.15-18545
06/17/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 27. Nos. 61715/65819/66452.15-18546
06/17/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 28. Nos. 61715/65819/66452.15-18547
06/17/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 29. Nos. 61715/65819/66452.15-18548
06/17/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 30. Nos. 61715/65819/66452.15-18549
06/17/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 31. Nos. 61715/65819/66452.15-18550
06/17/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 32. Nos. 61715/65819/66452.15-18551
06/18/2015BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. Nos. 61715/65819/66452.15-18744
07/02/2015MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Briefing Schedule for Respondents' Answering Brief (First Request). Nos. 61715/65819/66452.15-20163
07/02/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due: August 19, 2015. Nos. 61715/65819/66452.15-20168
08/19/2015BriefFiled Respondents Answering Brief. Nos. 61715/65819/66452.15-25131
08/19/2015AppendixFiled Respondents' Supplemental Appendix (Volume 33 of 33) (Pages 7843-7859). Nos. 61715/65819/66452.15-25132
08/24/2015MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Briefing Schedule (Reply Brief). Nos. 61715/65819/66452.15-25626
08/24/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due: October 19, 2015.15-25632
09/24/2015MotionFiled Appellant Cashman Equipment Company's Motion to Strike Respondent's Answering Brief. Nos. 61715/65819/66452.15-28935
10/02/2015MotionFiled Respondents' Opposition to Appellant Cashman Equipment Company's Motion to Strike Respondents' Answering Brief. Nos. 61715/65819/66452.15-29921
10/09/2015MotionFiled Appellant Cashman Equipment Company's Reply In Support of Motion to Strike Respondents Answering Brief. Nos. 61715/65819/66452.15-30791
10/20/2015BriefFiled Appellant Cashman Equipment Company's Reply Brief. Nos. 61715/65819/66452.15-31886
10/20/2015Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
11/02/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. We deny the motion to strike. Nos. 61715/65819/66452.15-33260
02/02/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar. Nos. 61715/65819/66452.16-03480
02/03/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Tuesday, April 5, 2016, at 10:30 am for 30 minutes in Las Vegas.16-03669
03/21/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. Nos. 61715/65819/6645216-08825
04/05/2016Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
09/29/2016Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded with instructions." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Cherry; J. Majority: Cherry/Parraguirre/Hardesty/Douglas/Gibbons/Pickering. Fn1[The Honorable Nancy M. Saitta, Justice, having retired, this matter was decided by a six-justice court.]132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 69. EN BANC Nos. 61715/65819/6645216-30273
10/24/2016RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Nos. 61715/65819/66452.16-33212
10/24/2016Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. Nos. 61715/65819/66452.
11/18/2016RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 31, 2016.16-33212
02/15/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter to Publishers regarding corrections on recently filed opinions. Nos. 68987/(61715/65819/66452)/66094/68434/(69611/70648)/(68523/68754/68770/68845)/(68949/68975)/69065/68033/69218 (Filed in Docket no. 68989, Document no. 17-05409)