The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 66473
Short Caption:MCCLENDON VS. COLLINSClassification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A680935Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: Panel
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:09/24/2014 / Reed, NathanielSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/15/2016How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/10/2014Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal.
09/10/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.14-29954
09/10/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.14-29962
09/16/2014Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Adam E. Brigman
09/18/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days.14-30964
09/24/2014Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Nathaniel J. Reed.14-31819
10/08/2014Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Docketing Statement Civil Appeals14-33484
11/06/2014Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: ECAR. Issued Notice to Settlement Judge Nathaniel Reed to file Early Case Assessment Report.14-36728
11/14/2014Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for December 15, 2014 at 1:30 p.m.14-37706
12/19/2014Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.14-41478
12/26/2014Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix.14-42193
01/08/2015Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Requested.15-00832
03/27/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Opening Brief and Appendix due: April 2, 2015.15-09363
04/02/2015BriefFiled Appellant Opening Brief.15-09939
04/02/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief.15-09974
06/09/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Answering Brief due: 11 days.15-17587
06/11/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Association of Counsel (Wade Hansard of McCormick, Barstow, Sheppard, Wayte & Carruth, LLP as counsel for the Respondent)15-17807
06/12/2015MotionFiled Motion for Extension to File Answering Brief Under Rule 26(b)(1)(A) and Rule 27(b).15-18042
06/18/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: July 20, 2015.15-18655
07/21/2015BriefFiled Answering Brief.15-21949
07/21/2015AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix.15-21950
09/03/2015Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. No reply brief filed.
01/15/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Oral argument will not be scheduled in this appeal and it shall stand submitted on the record and briefs filed herein, as of the date of this order.16-01554
04/21/2016Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before: Hardesty/Saitta/Pickering. Author: Saitta, J. Majority: Saitta/Hardesty/Pickering. 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 28. SNP16-JH/NS/KP16-12415
05/12/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter (dated 5/3/16) to Publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 65424/66816/67465/53626/62493/69580/65681/66473 (Letter entered in Docket No. 65424 as document no. 16-14923.)
05/16/2016RemittiturIssued Remittitur.16-15197
05/16/2016Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/10/2016RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 27, 2016.16-15197