Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 66474
Short Caption:BERRY (DEMARLO) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):35201, 52905, 66877
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C122520Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:DouglasCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:11/13/2015 at 10:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:11/13/2015How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/10/2014Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
09/10/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)14-29955
09/10/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Criminal. Due date: 10 days14-29960
09/11/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Compliance with NRAP 3(d)(2).14-30056
09/15/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement.14-30515
09/29/2014OtherJustice Michael L. Douglas disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Sat in District Court Proceedings
09/30/2014Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals.14-32384
10/01/2014MotionFiled Motion - Appellant's Notice Regarding Request for Transcript of Proceedings.14-32591
10/02/2014MotionFiled Appellant's Notice of Withdrawal of Notice Regarding Request for Transcript of Proceedings.14-32809
10/02/2014Transcript RequestFiled Certificate That No Transcript is Being Requested.14-32810
10/06/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Based on the notice of withdrawal filed on October 2, 2014, this court will take no action on the notice regarding request for transcript that was filed on October 1, 2014.14-33046
12/24/2014MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend the Briefing Schedule (First Request).14-42092
01/02/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice - Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief and Appendix due: January 16, 2015.15-00044
01/16/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume I of III.15-01765
01/16/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume II of III.15-01767
01/16/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume III of III.15-01768
01/16/2015BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.15-01850
02/18/2015BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.15-05218
02/18/2015AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix Volume 1.15-05250
02/18/2015AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix Volume 2.15-05220
02/18/2015AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix Volume 3.15-05223
02/18/2015AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix Volume 4.15-05225
02/18/2015AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix Volume 5.15-05226
02/18/2015AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix Volume 6. (PAGES 1019-1028 STRICKEN PER ORDER FILED ON 5/22/15).15-05227
03/20/2015BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.15-08543
03/20/2015Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision.
03/20/2015MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Strike Trial Court's Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order from Record on Appeal.15-08597
03/24/2015MotionFiled Response to Motion to Strike Trial Court's Finding of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order from Record on Appeal and Motion to File an Amended Answering Brief and Respondent's Appendix.15-08910
03/31/2015MotionFiled Appellant's Reply to State's Response to Motion to Strike.15-09610
05/22/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Before the court is appellant DeMarlo Berry's Motion to Strike Trial Court's "Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order" From Record on Appeal, filed March 20, 2015. Given respondent State of Nevada's joinder, the court grants the motion in full. The State shall file its amended answering brief on or before May 29, 2015.15-15871
05/27/2015BriefFiled Respondent's Amended Answering Brief.15-16154
07/01/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.15-20060
07/29/2015Letter/IncomingFiled Letter from Craig Coburn to Clerk of the Court re Oral Argument.15-22917
10/05/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Friday, November 13, 2015, at 10:30 am for 30 minutes in Carson City.15-30146
10/29/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.15-33077
11/13/2015Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP15-NS/KP/MG.
12/24/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled "Reversed and Remanded." Before Saitta, Gibbons, and Pickering, JJ. Author: Pickering, J., 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 96. NNP15.15-39575
01/20/2016RemittiturIssued Remittitur.16-01945
01/20/2016Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/02/2016RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on January 27, 2016.16-01945
03/24/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter to Publishers dated March 21, 2016, with corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 65390/62357/66410/66474/62931/64946/67331/65143/62649. (Letter entered in 65390 as document no. 16-09339)