The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 66565
Short Caption:PETIT VS. ADRIANZENClassification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D489540 C/W D489542Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: En Banc
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:09/29/2014 / Worrell, CarolynSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:09/07/2016 at 1:30 PMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:09/07/2016How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/23/2014Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court.
09/23/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)14-31601
09/23/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.14-31606
09/29/2014Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Telia U. Williams, Esq. Check No. 1074.
09/29/2014Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell.14-32349
09/29/2014TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Shelly Ajoub stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 2/05/14; 2/26/14; 3/19/14; and 6/10/14.14-32367
09/30/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Confidential Civil Coversheet.
10/14/2014Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.14-34024
11/26/2014Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for December 2, 2014, at 9:00 a.m.14-39031
12/12/2014Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: December 16, 2014, at 4:00 p.m.14-40588
05/07/2015Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.15-14043
05/14/2015Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 45 days opening brief and appendix.15-14790
06/26/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Opening Brief and Appendix due: July 7, 2015.15-19643
07/01/2015MotionFiled Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record.15-20109
07/06/2015MotionFiled Motion for extension of Time to File Opening Brief- Second Request.15-20390
07/10/2015MotionFiled Joint Motion and Order for Extension Of Time To File Opening Brief.15-21047
07/16/2015MotionFiled Reply to Respondent's Opposition to Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief.15-21525
07/20/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We grant the motion to withdraw as counsel. We direct the clerk of this court to remove attorney Michael S. Strange and Michael S. Strange & Associates, LLC as respondent's counsel in this appeal. Respondent's Notice of Appearance of Counsel due: 30 days. Briefing is suspended. fn1[We deny as moot the parties' motions for an extension of time to file the opening brief. Additionally, we direct the clerk of this court to return, unfiled, respondent's pro se opposition to the motions, received on July 14, 2015.]15-21774
07/28/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Notice of Pro Se Representation.15-22764
08/06/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Reinstating Briefing. On July 20, 2015, this court entered an order granting the motion of respondent's counsel to withdraw and suspending briefing in this appeal pending appellant's retention of counsel or notice that he intends to proceed in pro se. In response to our order, respondent has filed a letter indicating that he intends to proceed in this appeal in pro se. Accordingly, briefing is hereby reinstated. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). Failure to comply with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions. NRAP 31(d).15-23702
09/09/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Brief Appendix part 1. (PAGES 182-445 STRICKEN PER ORDER 1/12/16-THIS VOLUME-PAGES 182-198).15-27193
09/09/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Brief Appendix part 2. (PAGES 182-445 STRICKEN PER ORDER 1/12/16-THIS VOLUME-PAGES 199-299).15-27208
09/09/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Brief Appendix part 3. (PAGES 182-445 STRICKEN PER ORDER 1/12/16-THIS VOLUME-PAGES 300-445).15-27221
09/09/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Brief Appendix part 4. (PAGES 185-445 STRICKEN PER ORDER 1/12/16).15-27240
09/17/2015MotionFiled Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief-Special Review Requested. (Brief attached). (DETACHED OPENING BRIEF AND FILED SEPARATELY PER ORDER 10/12/15).15-28145
09/30/2015MotionFiled Proper Person Motion to Dismiss.15-29699
10/12/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time and Denying Motion to Dismiss. The clerk of this court shall detach the opening brief from the motion for extension filed on September 17, 2015, and file it separately in this matter. Answering Brief due: 30 days.15-30886
10/12/2015BriefFiled Opening Brief. (DETACHED FROM MOTION FILED ON 9/17/15 AND FILED SEPARATELY PER ORDER 10/12/15).15-30891
11/12/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance of Counsel for Respondent and Motion for Extension of Time to File Respondent's Answering Brief.15-34528
11/18/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: December 14, 2015.15-35277
12/07/2015TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter Sherry Justice stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 6/10/14.15-37233
12/14/2015MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief and to Strike Portions of Appellant's Appendix.15-38061
12/17/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: December 28, 2015.15-38522
12/24/2015AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix.15-39639
12/24/2015BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.15-39649
12/28/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service. (Answering Brief)15-39794
01/12/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall strike pages 182 through 445 of appellant's appendix.16-00935
01/25/2016Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Reply Brief due: February 1, 2016.16-02527
02/02/2016MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief - Second Request.16-03424
02/12/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant: Reply Brief due: February 22, 2016.16-04760
02/23/2016BriefFiled Reply Brief.16-05723
02/23/2016Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
03/07/2016MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Correct and Supplement Record.16-07168
03/17/2016Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Opposition to motion to correct and supplement record due: March 23, 2016.16-08435
03/24/2016MotionFiled Appellant's Opposition to Appellee's Post-Brief Motion (motion to correct and supplement the record).16-09266
03/29/2016MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time to File Respondent's Reply to Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Correct and Supplement Record.16-09854
04/04/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Cause appearing, respondent's motion for an extension of time to file a reply to appellant's opposition to the motion to correct and supplement the record is granted. NRAP 26(b)(1)(A). Respondent shall have until April 8, 2016, to file and serve the reply.16-10428
04/08/2016MotionFiled Reply to Opposition to Motion to Correct and Supplement Record.16-11038
04/21/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent has filed a motion to correct the record to include evidence that respondent's name is the same as his father's. We grant the motion; however, we caution the parties that in its review of this appeal, this court will not consider evidence not properly submitted to the district court.16-12465
08/12/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Wednesday, September 7, 2016, at 1:30 p.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City.16-25111
08/24/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.16-26449
09/07/2016Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
04/13/2017Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Fn1[The Honorable Lidia Stiglich, Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter.] Before the Court En Banc. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: hardesty/Cherry/Douglas/Gibbons/Pickering/Parraguirre. 133 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 15. EN BANC17-12191
05/08/2017RemittiturIssued Remittitur.17-15064
05/08/2017Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/18/2017RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 12, 2017.17-15064