The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 66568
Short Caption:BANK OF NEVADA VS. PETERSENClassification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A680012Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: En Banc
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:10/01/2014 / Kaufman, JerrySP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:02/10/2016 at 11:30 AMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:02/10/2016How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/24/2014Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court.
09/24/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)14-31714
09/24/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days.14-31717
09/24/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.14-31719
09/25/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement.14-31856
09/29/2014Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Snell & Wilmer L.L.P. Check No. 874837.
10/01/2014Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Jerry J. Kaufman.14-32722
10/07/2014Transcript RequestFiled Certificate That No Transcript Is Being Requested.14-33230
10/08/2014Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for Tuesday, December 16, 2014 at 9:00 a.m.14-33487
10/15/2014Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement (missing exhibit 8-refiled amended docketing statement)14-34183
10/15/2014Docketing StatementFiled Amended Docketing Statement.14-34230
10/15/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge.14-34252
10/17/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service of: (1) Docketing Statement (2) Amended Docketing Statement (on Settlement Judge).14-34577
12/22/2014Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.14-41802
12/26/2014Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 45 days to file the opening brief and appendix.14-42194
02/06/2015BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.15-04095
02/06/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 1.15-04097
02/06/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 2.15-04098
02/06/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 3.15-04099
02/06/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 4.15-04100
02/09/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Supplement.15-04229
03/05/2015MotionFiled Motion To Extend Time To File Answering Brief.15-06923
03/05/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief Due: April 8, 2015.15-06928
04/08/2015BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.15-10666
04/29/2015MotionFiled Stipulation and Order to Extend Time to file Reply Brief.15-13027
04/29/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due date: May 27, 2015.15-13029
05/27/2015BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.15-16176
05/27/2015Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
09/23/2015BriefFiled Appellant's Supplemental Authorities to Appellant's Opening Brief.15-28840
10/29/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. The court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.15-33033
12/10/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Wednesday, February 10, 2016, at 11:30 am for 30 minutes in Las Vegas.15-37756
01/29/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.16-03086
02/09/2016Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Changing Start Time for Oral Argument. This matter was previously scheduled for oral argument before a panel on Wednesday, February 10, 2016, at 11:30 a.m. The time for argument is hereby changed, and oral argument before the panel will be held on Wednesday, February 10, 2016, at the hour of 11;00 a.m. in Las Vegas.16-04318
02/10/2016Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP16-JH/NS/KP.
08/12/2016Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before: Hardesty/Saitta/Pickering. Author: Pickering, J. Majority: Pickering/Hardesty/Saitta. 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 64. SNP16-JH/NS/KP16-25011
08/24/2016MotionFiled Appellant's Bill of Costs.16-26410
08/29/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Notice Of Appearance On Behalf Of Respondent Murray Petersen (David Mincin as counsel for the Respondent).16-26825
08/29/2016Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent's Petition For Rehearing.16-26862
08/29/2016Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from David Mincin
09/27/2016Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). fn1[The Honorable Nancy M. Saitta, Justice, having retired, did not participate in the decision of this matter.]16-29973
10/06/2016Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent's Petition For En Banc Reconsideration.16-31191
10/13/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Appellant's Answer due: 15 days.16-32043
10/26/2016Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration.16-33580
11/23/2016Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC16-36508
12/19/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Costs. Appellants' request for costs is granted. Costs in the amount of $321.80 shall be taxed in favor of appellants against respondents. The clerk of this court is directed to issue an itemized statement of costs in the amount of $321.80 for insertion in the remittitur and to issue the remittitur forthwith.16-39337
12/19/2016RemittiturIssued Memorandum of Costs. Costs allowed and taxed:$321.80.16-39386
12/19/2016RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Memorandum of Costs and Disbursements allowed and taxed in the amount of $321.80.16-39390
12/19/2016Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/12/2017RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on December 28, 2016.16-39390