Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 66652
Short Caption:MOORE (RANDOLPH) VS. STATE (DEATH PENALTY-PC)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):36945, 38750, 40232, 46801, 54544, 55091, 63703
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C069269Classification:Criminal Appeal - Death Penalty - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:DouglasCase Status:Remittitur Stayed
Replacement:None for Chief Justice DouglasPanel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:11/07/2017 at 10:00 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:11/07/2017How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/07/2014Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
10/07/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)14-33353
10/14/2014OtherJustice Michael L. Douglas disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Sat in District Court Proceedings
10/23/2014Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request (Certification Under NRAP 9(a)).14-35314
10/28/2014Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals.14-35760
10/28/2014Docketing StatementFiled Amended Docketing Statement.14-35907
02/04/2015MotionFiled Request for Extension of Time Within Which to File Appellant's Opening Brief.15-03760
02/13/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief due: May 5, 2015.15-04869
05/05/2015MotionFiled Request for Extension of Time Within Which to File Appellant's Opening Brief.15-13731
05/15/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant: Opening Brief due: June 4, 2015.15-14930
06/05/2015BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.15-17129
06/05/2015MotionFiled Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Appendix.15-17130
06/08/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 1.15-17443
06/08/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volumes 2-41 (via FTP).15-17442
06/08/2015AppendixFiled Appendix Master Index (For Volumes 2-41).15-17444
06/11/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant has filed a motion for leave to file a supplemental appendix containing additional transcripts. Cause appearing, we grant the motion. The clerk of this court shall file the supplemental appendix, volume 1 through 5, provisionally received in this court on June 5, 2015.15-17811
06/11/2015AppendixFiled Supplemental Appendix Vol. 1.15-17812
06/11/2015AppendixFiled Supplemental Appendix Vol. 2.15-17813
06/11/2015AppendixFiled Supplemental Appendix Vol. 3.15-17814
06/11/2015AppendixFiled Supplemental Appendix Vol 4.15-17815
06/11/2015AppendixFiled Supplemental Appendix Vol 5.15-17816
07/06/2015MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time - First Request.15-20381
07/24/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: September 4, 2015.15-22477
09/01/2015BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief..15-26531
09/01/2015AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix.15-26576
10/02/2015MotionFiled Appellant's Request for Extension of Time Within Which to File Appellant's Reply Brief.15-29901
10/16/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Reply Brief due: December 30, 2015.15-31502
12/23/2015BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.15-39462
12/23/2015Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision.
07/24/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.17-24463
09/25/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Tuesday, November 7, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. for 60 minutes in Carson City.17-32457
10/23/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.17-36258
10/30/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Notice of Supplemental Authority.17-37082
11/01/2017BriefFiled Respondent's Notice of Supplemental Authorities.17-37352
11/07/2017Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
02/09/2018Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn1[The Honorable Michael Douglas, Chief Justice, voluntarily recused himself from participation of this matter.] EN BANC18-05450
02/15/2018MotionFiled Motion to Publish February 9, 2018 Order of Affirmance.18-06276
02/27/2018MotionFiled Request for Extension of Time Within Which to File Appellant's Petition for Rehearing.18-07784
03/06/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Petition for Rehearing due: March 29, 2018.18-08729
03/29/2018Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for Rehearing.18-12241
04/27/2018Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). fn1 [The Honorable Michael Douglas, Chief Justice, voluntarily recused himself from participation in the decision of this matter.]18-16097
05/01/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Stay the Remittitur.18-16398
05/03/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Staying Issuance of Remittitur. We hereby stay issuance of the remittitur until August 27, 2018. If the clerk of this court receives written notice by August 27, 2018, from the clerk of the United States Supreme Court that appellant has filed a petition for a writ of certiorari, the stay shall continue in effect until final disposition of the certiorari proceedings. If such notice is not received by August 27, 2018, the remittitur shall issue forthwith.18-16907
05/17/2018Opinion/Non-DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Affirmed." Fn1[The Honorable Michael Douglas, Chief Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter.] Fn2[We previously issued our decision in this matter in an unpublished order.We grant the State's motion to reissue the order as an opinion, and issue this opinion in place of our prior order.]Before the Court En Banc. Majority: Cherry/Gibbons/Pickering/Hardesty/Parraguirre/ Stiglich. 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 35. EN BANC18-18812
07/23/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from the United States Supreme Court. The application for an extension of time within which to file a petition for a writ of certiorari in the above-entitled case has been presented to Justice Kennedy, who on July 17, 2018, extended the time to and including September 24, 2018.18-28157
08/14/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Continue Stay of Remittitur.18-31429
08/22/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's motion for an extension of the stay of the remittitur is granted. We hereby continue the stay of issuance of the remittitur until October 1, 2018. If the clerk of this court receives written notice by October 1, 2018, from the clerk of the United States Supreme Court that appellant has filed a petition for a writ of certiorari, the stay shall continue in effect until final disposition of the certiorari proceedings. If such notice is not received by October 1, 2018, the remittitur shall issue forthwith.18-32650
10/02/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Continue Stay of Remittitur.18-38395
10/10/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from US Supreme Court/Certiorari Filed. A petition for a writ of certiorari was filed on September 24, 2018 and placed on the docket October 2, 2018 as Case No. 18-6182.18-39670
10/10/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant's motion for an extension of the stay of the remittitur is granted. Accordingly, the stay of the issuance of the remittitur in the instant appeal shall continue in effect until final disposition of the certiorari proceedings in the United States Supreme Court.18-39787